Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992109

EP0992109 - SIMPLIFIED RECEIVER FOR FREQUENCY SHIFT KEYED SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.05.2005  [2005/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / VAN DEN ENDEN, Adrianus, W., M.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / SUERMONDT, Rutgerus, E., E., F.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Deguelle, Wilhelmus H. G. , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Deguelle, Wilhelmus Hendrikus Gerardus , et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date99911972.015.04.1999
[2000/15]
WO1999IB00660
Priority number, dateEP1998020137128.04.1998         Original published format: EP 98201371
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9956399
Date:04.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992109
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE29.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H03D3/00, H04L27/14
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/15]
TitleGerman:VEREINFACHTER EMPFÄNGER FÜR FSK SIGNALE[2000/16]
English:SIMPLIFIED RECEIVER FOR FREQUENCY SHIFT KEYED SIGNALS[2000/15]
French:RECEPTEUR SIMPLIFIE DESTINE A DES SIGNAUX MODULES PAR DEPLACEMENT DE FREQUENCE[2000/15]
Former [2000/15]VEREINFACHTER EMPFÄNGER FÜR FSK SIGNALEN
Entry into regional phase28.01.2000National basic fee paid 
28.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
22.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/18]
03.12.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2308514  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS LTD [GB]);
 [A]US5022048  (KINGSTON SAMUEL C [US], et al);
 [AP]US5781076  (IWAMATSU TAKANORI [JP], et al);
 [A]EP0415406  (NEC CORP [JP]);
 [A]US4603393  (LAURENT PIERRE [FR], et al)