Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1062831

EP1062831 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.06.2006
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO
Anna van Buerenplein 1
2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL
[N/P]
Former [2005/52]For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast-natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
Former [2000/52]For all designated states
Koninklijke KPN N.V.
Stationsplein 7
9726 AE Groningen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / PIETERSE, Rob
Verbenalaan 1
NL-2111 ZL Aerdenhout / NL
02 / DE LEEUW, Edo, Mark, Alexander
Asterstraat 31
NL-3551 SW Utrecht / NL
03 / VAN DER PUT, Ronald, Robertus, Gerardus, L.
Hoekmanstraat 26
NL-1315 JN Almere / NL
[2000/52]
Representative(s)Prins, Adrianus Willem
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2003/14]Prins, Adrianus Willem
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date99911999.310.03.1999
[2000/52]
WO1999IB00702
Priority number, dateNL1998100854810.03.1998         Original published format: NL 1008548
[2000/52]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9946745
Date:16.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/37]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1062831
Date:27.12.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1999
[2000/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1062831
Date:03.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04Q9/04, H04L12/403
[2000/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/52]
TitleGerman:DATENÜBERTRAGUNG VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM[2000/52]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING DATA[2000/52]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES[2000/52]
Entry into regional phase21.10.1999Translation filed 
10.10.2000National basic fee paid 
10.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
14.11.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
21.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2005Fee for grant paid
14.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)04.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28]
Request for further processing for:27.05.2005Request for further processing filed
27.05.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.06.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
08.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.08.2005
BE03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
IT03.08.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
LU31.03.2006
[2008/17]
Former [2007/22]AT03.08.2005
BE03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
LU31.03.2006
Former [2006/26]AT03.08.2005
BE03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2006/25]AT03.08.2005
BE03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2006/14]AT03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
Former [2006/13]AT03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
SE03.11.2005
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0529269  (IBM [US]) [A] 1,10 * column 5, line 28 - column 12, line 42 *;
 [DA]US5297144  (GILBERT SHELDON L [US], et al) [DA] 1,10 * column 10, line 61 - column 13, line 27 *;
 [DA]US4466001  (MOORE MORRIS A [US], et al) [DA] 1,10