Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1017036

EP1017036 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING DEVIATION OF AUTOMOBILE FROM LANE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.08.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.09.2003  [2003/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology, Independent Administrative Institution
3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/35]For all designated states
National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology, Independent Administrative Institution
3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
JAPAN as Represented by DIRECTOR GENERAL OF AGENCY OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY
3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0013 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KATO, Shin
Mech. Engin. Lab., Agency of Ind.Sci. Tech.
1-2, Namiki Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0044 / JP
02 / TSUGAWA, Sadayuki
Mech. Engin. Lab., Agency of Ind.Sci. Tech.
1-2, Namiki Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0044 / JP
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Smith, Norman Ian , et al
Cleveland
40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Smith, Norman Ian , et al
fJ CLEVELAND 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
Application number, filing date99912077.731.03.1999
[2000/27]
WO1999JP01688
Priority number, dateJP1998013663319.05.1998         Original published format: JP 13663398
[2000/27]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9960545
Date:25.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1017036
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1017036
Date:02.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP25.11.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:G08G1/16, G05D1/02
[2001/32]
Former International [2000/27]G08G1/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2000/27]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNGZUR DETEKTIERUNG DER ABWEICHUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS RELATIV ZU EINER VERKEHRSSPUR[2000/27]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING DEVIATION OF AUTOMOBILE FROM LANE[2000/27]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DETECTION DE LA DEVIATION D'UNE AUTOMOBILE PAR RAPPORT A UNE VOIE DE CIRCULATION[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase16.02.2000Translation filed 
16.02.2000National basic fee paid 
16.02.2000Search fee paid 
16.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
16.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
13.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.05.2002Fee for grant paid
25.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US5485378  (FRANKE UWE [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 11 - column 4, line 26; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5448487  (ARAI KAZUMASA [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 21; figures 1,3,6 *;
 [A]EP0640903  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * page 4, line 8 - page 12, line 10; figures 1,9,10,12 *;
 [A]EP0394474  (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *
International search[A]JPH09218937  (NIPPON SOKEN);
 [A]JPH0816998  (MAZDA MOTOR);
 [A]JPH0789443  (NISSAN MOTOR)