Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994013

EP0994013 - DETACHABLE PAD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.01.2006
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fukuyama Gomu Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-63, Matsuhama-cho 3-chome
Fukuyama-shi, Hiroshima-ken 720-0802 / JP
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KATOH, Yusaku
2801-4, Yamate-cho
Fukuyama-shi, Hiroshima-ken 720-0092 / JP
02 / ODA, Satoru
389, Tomo-cho Tomo
Fukuyama-shi, Hiroshima-ken 720-0201 / JP
03 / OZAKI, Hirotaka
1114-1, Nishioshima
Kasaoka-shi, Okayama-ken 714-0032 / JP
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen
European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
Former [2004/26]Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen
European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
Former [2000/16]Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR
Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
Application number, filing date99912094.201.04.1999
[2000/16]
WO1999JP01724
Priority number, dateJP1998010692201.04.1998         Original published format: JP 10692298
[2000/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9951483
Date:14.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994013
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999
[2000/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.10.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.2004
ClassificationInternational:B62D55/28
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/16]
TitleGerman:AUSWECHSELBARES LAUFPOLSTER[2000/16]
English:DETACHABLE PAD[2000/16]
French:PATIN DETACHABLE[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase23.12.1999Translation filed 
23.12.1999National basic fee paid 
23.12.1999Search fee paid 
23.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
12.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/09]
28.09.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200103   M06   Fee paid on   10.10.2001
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH08244659  ;
 [Y]GB432330  (ANDRE JEAN LAPORTE) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 1997, no. 01, [Y] 1,2 * abstract *
International search[YE]JPH10119843  (MITSUBISHI STEEL MFG);
 [YE]JPH10157666  (SUZUKI SHOJI KK);
 [YE]JPH11157472  (OHTSU TIRE & RUBBER CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH08282559  (OHTSU TIRE & RUBBER CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH08244659  (TOPY IND);
 [Y]JPH08119165  (SUZUKI SHOJI KK);
 [Y]JPH09301233  (YUTANI JUKO KK, et al);
 [Y]JPS4318334Y