Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1097763

EP1097763 - CONTINUOUS CASTING NOZZLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.08.2005
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Akechi Ceramics Kabushiki Kaisha
1614, Akechi-cho Ena-gun
Gifu-ken 509-7795 / JP
For all designated states
TOKYO YOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
Tekko Building, 8-2, 1-chome, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]For all designated states
Akechi Ceramics Kabushiki Kaisha
1614, Akechi-cho
Ena-gun Gifu-ken 509-7795 / JP
For all designated states
TOKYO YOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
Tekko Building, 8-2, 1-chome, Marunouchi
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ANDO, Mituru
167-1, Ohizumi, Akechi-cho
Ena-gun, Gifu-ken 509-7721 / JP
02 / OGURI, Kazumi
3146-2, Kamado-cho
Mizunami-shi, Gifu-ken 509-6472 / JP
03 / MUROI, Toshiyuki
1028, Oda-cho
Mizunami-shi, Gifu-ken 509-6112 / JP
04 / TAKASU, Toshikazu
4-1, Myogadai
Mizunami-shi, Gifu-ken 509-6105 / JP
 [2001/19]
Representative(s)Rausch Wanischeck-Bergmann Brinkmann
Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte
Am Seestern 8
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte
Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date99912101.505.04.1999
[2001/19]
WO1999JP01787
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0059657
Date:12.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1097763
Date:09.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2000
[2001/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1097763
Date:29.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.10.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:B22D11/10, B22D41/50, B22D41/54
[2001/46]
Former International [2001/19]B22D11/10, B22D41/50
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/19]
TitleGerman:STRANGGIESSDÜSE[2001/19]
English:CONTINUOUS CASTING NOZZLE[2001/19]
French:TUYERE DE COULEE EN CONTINU[2001/19]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2000Translation filed 
15.06.2000National basic fee paid 
15.06.2000Search fee paid 
15.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2000Examination requested  [2001/19]
12.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.07.2004Fee for grant paid
07.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT29.09.2004
ES09.01.2005
[2008/17]
Former [2005/27]ES09.01.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0885674  (SHINAGAWA REFRACTORIES CO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * claims 1-3 *;
 [A]GB2202218  (DE BEERS IND DIAMOND) [A] 1-6 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 16; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]DE1808778  (YAWATA IRON & STEEL CO) [A] 1-6 * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]  - FALBE J ET AL, ROEMPP CHEMIE LEXIKON, PASSAGE "PYROPHYLLIT", ROEMPP CHEMIE LEXIKON. PL -S, STUTTGART, THIEME VERLAG, DE, VOL. BD. 5, PAGE(S) 3708-3709, XP002048137 [A] 1-6 * page 3709, column L, paragraph 1 *
International search[Y]JPH10166117  (AKECHI CERAMICS KK);
 [Y]JPS59121146  (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al);
 [A]JPS63303666  (NIPPON KOKAN KK);
 [A]JPH10146655  (SHINAGAWA REFRACTORIES CO)
ExaminationEP0846514
 JPH02172859