Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992598

EP0992598 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING ALUMINUM ALLOY FOR FLATTENING MATERIAL AND ALUMINUM ALLOY FLATTENING MATERIAL FOR AUTOMOBILES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.04.2004  [2004/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8322 / JP
For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-0062 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd.
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8322 / JP
For all designated states
Honda Giken Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-0062 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OHYAMA, Koji The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd.
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP
02 / BEKKI, Yoichiro The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd.
6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP
03 / HAYASHI, Noboru K. K. Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho
4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0113 / JP
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Forstmeyer, Dietmar , et al
BOETERS & LIECK
Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Forstmeyer, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date99912122.106.04.1999
[2000/15]
WO1999JP01823
Priority number, dateJP1998011272708.04.1998         Original published format: JP 11272798
JP1998011272808.04.1998         Original published format: JP 11272898
[2000/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9953110
Date:21.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992598
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.10.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:C22C1/02, C22B9/16, C22B21/00
[2002/44]
Former International [2000/15]C22C1/02
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2000/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNG ZUM PLANIEREN VON MATERIALIEN UND VERWENDUNG BEI AUTOMOBILEN[2000/15]
English:METHOD OF MANUFACTURING ALUMINUM ALLOY FOR FLATTENING MATERIAL AND ALUMINUM ALLOY FLATTENING MATERIAL FOR AUTOMOBILES[2000/15]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM POUR MATERIAUX A APLATIR ET MATERIAUX A APLATIR D'ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM POUR AUTOMOBILES[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase08.12.1999Translation filed 
08.12.1999National basic fee paid 
08.12.1999Search fee paid 
08.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
24.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/15]
07.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0985736  (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD ;HONDA MOTOR CO LTD (JP)) [E] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0006] , [0009] , [0015] , [0042] , [0043] , [0049] * * paragraph [0049]; examples 1A,1APRIME,1B,1C,1D,1E; tables 1,2 * * paragraph [0064]; examples 2A,2APRIME,2B,2C,2D,2H; tables 6,7 * * claims 1,3,5,10,12,14 *;
 [X]FR2162745  (SOUTHWIRE CO) [X] 1,2,6,7,9 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0811700  (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG) [X] 4,5,10-13 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 11 * * page 4, line 27 - line 51 * * figure 1; claims 1-5,11 *;
 [PX]JPH1161311  ;
 [PX]JPH1171623  ;
 [E]EP1008665  (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD ;HONDA MOTOR CO LTD (JP)) [E] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11061311 A 19990305 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [PX] 4,5,10-13 * abstract * * page 5; examples 9,23,30; table 1 *
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11071623 A 19990316 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [PX] 4,5,10-13 * abstract * * page 5; examples 8-10; table 1 *
 [X]  - HUFNAGEL W, Key to Aluminium Alloys, 4th Edition, ALUMINIUM-SCHLUESSEL = KEY TO ALUMINIUM ALLOYS, XX, XX, PAGE(S) 195-205, XP002194851 [X] 4,5,10-13 * page 200; example 6103 * * page 201; examples X6206,6009,6010,6110,6011,X6013,6061,6261 * * page 202; examples 6066,6070, *
International search[A]JPH07207350  ;
 [A]JPH08225874  ;
 [A]JPH0754061