EP1068078 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PATTERNWISE PRINTING OF PIXELS CONSISTING OF ONE OR MORE DOTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stork Digital Imaging B.V. Handelstraat 6 5831 AV Boxmeer / NL | [2001/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAUN, Robert, Evert, Anthony Julie Postelsingel 67 NL-5831 DJ Boxmeer / NL | 02 /
SMALLEGANGE, Martin, Jan Claudiuslaan 59 NL-6642 AE Beuningen / NL | 03 /
MANDERS, Martinus, Gerardus, Jozef Putter 10 NL-5831 MJ Boxmeer / NL | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | du Pont, Jeroen Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | du Pont, Jeroen Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | ||
Former [2001/03] | Bakkum, Ruben Joseph, et al van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 99912168.4 | 29.03.1999 | [2001/03] | WO1999NL00180 | Priority number, date | NL19981008760 | 31.03.1998 Original published format: NL 1008760 | [2001/03] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9950074 | Date: | 07.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1068078 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/21, H04N1/04 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
B41J2/2132 (EP);
H04N1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/03] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM MUSTERWEISEN DRUCKEN VON BILDELEMENTEN AUS EINEM ODER MEHREREN PUNKTEN | [2001/03] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PATTERNWISE PRINTING OF PIXELS CONSISTING OF ONE OR MORE DOTS | [2001/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE SERVANT A IMPRIMER SOUS FORME DE MOTIFS DES PIXELS CONSTITUES PAR UN OU PLUSIEURS POINTS | [2001/03] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.1999 | Translation filed | 21.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/31] | 26.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPS60107356 (RICOH KK) [X] 1,2,5-10,13,16-18,20 [Y] 3,4,11,12,14,15; | JPS60107356 [ ]; | [Y]JPH1044398 (FUJI XEROX CO. LTD.) [Y] 3,4,11,12; | JPH1044398 [ ]; | [Y]EP0172592 (N.V. PHILIPS' GLOEILAMPENFABRIEKEN) [Y] 14,15 * column 3, line 5 - line 22 * * column 14, line 9 - line 43 *; | [A]JPS5573560 ; | [A]JPS5613179 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851015), vol. 9, no. 256, Database accession no. (M - 421), & JP60107356 A 19850615 (RICOH KK) [ ] * abstract * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 98, no. 6, & JP10044398 A 19980217 (FUJI XEROX CO. LTD.) [ ] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800819), vol. 4, no. 116, Database accession no. (M - 027), & JP55073560 A 00000000 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810424), vol. 5, no. 61, Database accession no. (M - 065), & JP56013179 A 19810209 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |