EP0980542 - METHOD OF PATTERNING SUB-0.25 LAMBDA LINE FEATURES WITH HIGH TRANSMISSION, "ATTENUATED" PHASE SHIFT MASKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML MaskTools B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [2004/39] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states ASML Masktools B.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states ASML Masktools Netherlands B.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, J., Fung 11752 Pine Brook Lane Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
CALDWELL, Roger 322 Summerwind Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 03 /
LAIDIG, Tom 201 Cottage Avenue Point Richmond, CA 94801 / US | 04 /
WAMPLER, Kurt, E. 1098 Cascade Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2000/08] | Representative(s) | Weenink, Willem, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property De Run 6501 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Weenink, Willem, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/09] | Van den Hooven, Jan, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/33] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/08] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99912219.5 | 16.03.1999 | [2000/08] | WO1999US03741 | Priority number, date | US19980078281P | 17.03.1998 Original published format: US 78281 P | [2000/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9947981 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0980542 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G03F9/00 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
G03F1/32 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/2063 (KR);
G03F1/26 (EP,US);
G03F1/30 (KR);
G03F1/34 (EP,US);
G03F1/36 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON SUB-0,25 LAMBDA LINIEN MITTELS EINER GEDÄMPFTEN PHASENSCHIEBERMASKE MIT HOHER TRANSMISSION | [2000/08] | English: | METHOD OF PATTERNING SUB-0.25 LAMBDA LINE FEATURES WITH HIGH TRANSMISSION, "ATTENUATED" PHASE SHIFT MASKS | [2000/08] | French: | PROCEDE DE FORMATION DE DETAILS DE LIGNES INFERIEURS A 0,25 LAMBDA A L'AIDE DE MASQUES HAUTE TRANSMISSION A DEPHASAGE "ATTENUE" | [2000/08] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 17.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 22.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/03] | 10.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0464492 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10,18-25 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0620498 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-10,18-25 * the whole document *; | [A]US5324600 (JINBO HIDEYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 11,26 * figures 8,12 *; | [A]US5633102 (TOH KENNY K H [US], et al) | [A] - WATANABE H ET AL, "Sub-quarter-micron gate pattern fabrication using a transparent phase shifting mask", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY B (MICROELECTRONICS PROCESSING AND PHENOMENA) USA, (199111), vol. 9, no. 6, ISSN 0734-211X, pages 3172 - 3175, XP002359979 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.585311 | International search | [Y]US5538815 (OI KAZUKO [JP], et al); | [Y]US5436095 (MIZUNO FUMIO [JP], et al) |