Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1061899

EP1061899 - LIQUID ANTIMICROBIAL, SKIN MOISTURIZING FORMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.10.2007
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/52]For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SHICK, Richard, Lee
340 South Vineyard Way
Alpharetta, GA 30201 / US
02 / DI SAPIO, Alfred, Joseph
10 Alexander Street
Greenwich, CT 06831-5156 / US
[2000/52]
Representative(s)Beacham, Annabel Rose
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/21]Beacham, Annabel Rose
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [2000/52]Davies, Christopher Robert
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date99912645.117.03.1999
[2000/52]
WO1999US05885
Priority number, dateUS19980078261P17.03.1998         Original published format: US 78261 P
US1999026682512.03.1999         Original published format: US 266825
US1999026839315.03.1999         Original published format: US 268393
[2000/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9947105
Date:23.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1061899
Date:27.12.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999
[2000/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1061899
Date:20.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/51]
Search report(s)International search reportEP16.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61Q19/00, A61K8/11, A61K8/19, A61K8/26, A61K8/73, A61Q17/00, A61K8/81
[2006/26]
Former International [2000/52]A61K7/48, A61K7/00
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/52]
TitleGerman:FLÜSSIGES ANTIMIKROBIELLES FEUCHTHALTENDES MITTEL FÜR DIE HAUT[2000/52]
English:LIQUID ANTIMICROBIAL, SKIN MOISTURIZING FORMULATION[2000/52]
French:FORMULATION POUR LA PEAU HYDRATANTE, ANTIMICROBIENNE ET LIQUIDE[2000/52]
Entry into regional phase17.10.2000National basic fee paid 
17.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
11.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.06.2006
19.05.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.06.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
20.10.2006Fee for grant paid
20.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
04.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
06.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE20.12.2006
NL20.12.2006
[2008/17]
Former [2007/31]BE20.12.2006
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9100087  (JOHNSON & SON INC S C [US]) [X] 1,2,6-9,13-21,23-26,28 * page 1, lines 6-9 * * page 4 * * page 7, lines 30-38 * * page 9, lines 16-38 * * examples 1-4,7-9,11-21 * * claims 1,4,7,10 * [Y] 1-28;
 [Y]EP0061701  (WICKHEN PRODUCTS INC [US]) [Y] 1-28 * page 2, lines 1-12 * * page 4, lines 34-38 * * page 7, lines 1-25 * * page 8, lines 23-33 * * table 1 * * claims 1-3,9,11-13 *;
 [X]EP0792635  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,13-15,28 * the whole document *