EP1075631 - ELECTRONIC CONTROLLED EXPANSION VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN STANDARD INC. One Centennial Avenue, P.O. Box 261 Piscataway, New Jersey 08855-6820 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | For all designated states AMERICAN STANDARD INC. One Centennial Avenue, P.O. Box 261 Piscataway, New Jersey 08855-6820 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYER, Jonathan, M. 8118 East Water Stone Court Nampa, ID 83687 / US | 02 /
SIBIK, Lee, L. 1306 Third Avenue North Onalaska, WI 54650 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Sean A. 2110 Madison Street La Crosse, WI 54601 / US | [2002/31] |
Former [2001/19] | 01 /
MEYER, Jonathan, M. 8112 East Water Stone Court Nampa, ID 83687 / US | ||
02 /
SIBIK, Lee, L. 1306 Third Avenue North Onalaska, WI 54650 / US | |||
03 /
SMITH, Sean A. 2110 Madison Street La Crosse, WI 54601 / US | |||
Former [2001/07] | 01 /
MEYER, Jonathan, M. 812 Robert Place Onalaska, WI 54650 / US | ||
02 /
SIBIK, Lee, L. 1306 Third Avenue North Onalaska, WI 54650 / US | |||
03 /
SMITH, Sean A. 2110 Madison Street La Crosse, WI 54601 / US | Representative(s) | Abbie, Andrew Kenneth, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | Abbie, Andrew Kenneth, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99912839.0 | 23.03.1999 | [2001/07] | WO1999US06335 | Priority number, date | US19980069788 | 29.04.1998 Original published format: US 69788 | [2001/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9956066 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1075631 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1075631 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F25B41/06, G05D27/00 | [2001/07] | CPC: |
F25B41/315 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2001/07] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCH GEREGELTES ENTSPANNUNGSVENTIL | [2001/07] | English: | ELECTRONIC CONTROLLED EXPANSION VALVE | [2001/07] | French: | ROBINET DETENDEUR A COMMANDE ELECTRONIQUE | [2001/07] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/07] | 23.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5136855 (LENARDUZZI FRANK J [CA]) [A] 1-3,5-8,10-15,17,18 * column 5, line 34 - line 61; figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO9739285 (YORK INT CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,5,6,9-11,13-18 * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 12, paragraph 3; figures 1-5E *; | [A]US5655379 (JASTER HEINZ [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5,6,10,13,14,16 * column 2, line 41 - column 7, line 12; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5168715 (NAKAO MASAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,5,7,8,14,15 * column 4, line 22 - column 9, line 61; figures 1-14 *; | [DA]US5632154 (SIBIK LEE L [US], et al) [DA] 1,5,10,14 * column 4, line 48 - column 11, line 15; figures 1-7 *; | [DA]US5419146 (SIBIK LEE L [US], et al) [DA] 1,3,5,14 * column 3, line 25 - column 8, line 64; figures 1-4B *; | [A]US4475686 (HUELLE ZBIGNIEW R [DK], et al); | [A]EP0443099 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]); | [A]US5187944 (JAROSCH GEORGE W [US]); | [A]US3781533 (BARNSTONE L, et al) | by applicant | US5341658 | US5431025 | US5347821 | US5600960 | US5645124 | US5588596 | US5419146 | US5632154 | US5011112 | US5000009 |