Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1067930

EP1067930 - ANTAGONISTS OF GONADOTROPIN RELEASING HORMONE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.03.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 08.07.2009  [2009/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck & Co., Inc.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/03]For all designated states
MERCK & CO., INC.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WALSH, Thomas, F.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
02 / UJJAINWALLA, Feroze
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
03 / GOULET, Mark, T.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
 [2001/03]
Representative(s)Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc.
European Patent Department
Terlings Park
Eastwick Road, Harlow
Essex CM20 2QR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/28]Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow
Essex CM20 2QR / GB
Former [2001/03]Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road
Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB
Application number, filing date99912924.029.03.1999
[2001/03]
WO1999US06726
Priority number, dateUS19980080405P02.04.1998         Original published format: US 80405 P
GB1998001585421.07.1998         Original published format: GB 9815854
[2001/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9951232
Date:14.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1067930
Date:17.01.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999
[2001/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.10.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/445, A61K31/495, A61K31/50, A61K31/52, A61K31/54, A61K31/505, A61K31/535, C07D401/12, C07D401/14, C07D403/12, C07D519/00
[2002/38]
Former International [2001/03]A61K31/445, A61K31/495, A61K31/50, A61K31/52, A61K31/54, A61K31/505, A61K31/535, C07D401/12, C07D401/14, C07D403/12, C07D403/14, C07D471/04, C07D473/00, C07D475/00, C07D487/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/03]
Extension statesAL02.11.2000
LT02.11.2000
LV02.11.2000
MK02.11.2000
RO02.11.2000
SI02.11.2000
TitleGerman:ANTAGONISTEN DES GONADOLIBERINS[2001/03]
English:ANTAGONISTS OF GONADOTROPIN RELEASING HORMONE[2001/03]
French:ANTAGONISTES DE L'HORMONE LIBERANT LA GONADOTROPINE (GNRH)[2001/03]
Entry into regional phase02.11.2000National basic fee paid 
02.11.2000Search fee paid 
02.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
02.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/03]
01.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/17]
18.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9721704  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * Abstract; claim 1-23; page 83, example 5A; page 85, examples 6P, 6R. *;
 [E]WO9951233  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [E] 1,4-16 * Abstract; claim 1. *
International search[A]US5714495  (VIAUD MARIE-CLAUDE [FR], et al);
 [AP]US5849764  (GOULET MARK [US], et al);
 [A]WO9714682  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al);
 [AP]  - CHO et al., "Discovery of a Novel, Potent and Orally Active Nonpeptide Antagonist of the Human Luteinizing Hormone-Releasing Hormone (LHRH) Receptor", J. MED. CHEM., 1998, Vol. 41, No. 22, pages 4190-4195, XP002918858,