Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099329

EP1099329 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANAGING CLIENT REQUESTS IN CLIENT-SERVER NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.11.2008
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.07.2011  [2011/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/12]For all designated states
INTEL CORPORATION
2200 Mission College Boulevard, SC4-202
Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
Ipivot, Inc.
12568 Kirkham Court
Poway, CA 92064 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JARDIN, Cary, A.
12 Calle de las Rosas
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
02 / SCHNETZLER, Steven
28373 Alamar
Valley Center, CA 92082 / US
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2001/20]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99912946.330.03.1999
[2001/20]
WO1999US06911
Priority number, dateUS1998005430402.04.1998         Original published format: US 54304
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9952254
Date:14.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1099329
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1099329
Date:26.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/20]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERWALTEN VON ANFORDERUNGEN DER BENUTZER IN BENUTZER-ANBIETER-NETZEN[2007/48]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANAGING CLIENT REQUESTS IN CLIENT-SERVER NETWORKS[2001/20]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE GESTION DE DEMANDES CLIENT DANS DES RESEAUX CLIENT/SERVEUR[2001/20]
Former [2001/20]SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERWALTEN VON ANFORDERUNGEN DER BENUTZER IN BENUTZER-ANBIETER-NETZE
Entry into regional phase26.02.2001National basic fee paid 
26.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
26.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
03.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.2007Fee for grant paid
12.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.09.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
26.01.2001DE   M01   Fee paid on   26.02.2001
26.01.2001FR   M01   Fee paid on   26.02.2001
26.01.2001GB   M01   Fee paid on   26.02.2001
26.01.2001IT   M01   Fee paid on   26.02.2001
26.01.2001NL   M01   Fee paid on   26.02.2001
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
26.01.2001M01   Fee paid on   26.02.2001
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200406   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.2004
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL26.12.2007
IT31.03.2008
[2011/28]
Former [2008/27]NL26.12.2007
Cited inInternational search[PX]EP0865180  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC) [PX] 1,11 * column 3, line 6 - line 35 *;
 [A]US5708832  (INNISS HADYN A ET AL) [A] 1-19 * column 3, line 26 - line 60 *
 [A]  - ADLER R M, "DISTRIBUTED COORDINATION MODELS FOR CLIENT/SERVER COMPUTING", COMPUTER, (19950401), vol. 28, no. 4, ISSN 0018-9162, pages 14 - 22, XP000507856 [A] 1-19 * page 15, column R, line 1 - page 16, column L, line 4 * * page 17, column R, line 18 - page 18, column L, line 30 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2.375173