Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1054741

EP1054741 - INSTALLATION FOR SORTING FLAT MAIL ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.03.2003
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.04.2003  [2003/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHUSTER, Rudolf
Graf-Andechs-Strasse 8
D-85551 Kirchheim / DE
02 / ROMEDER, Josef
Feldmeierbogen 16
D-81245 München / DE
03 / BRIXIUS, Wolfgang
Kreuzstrasse 3
D-91077 Neunkirchen / DE
[2000/48]
Application number, filing date99913072.716.02.1999
[2000/48]
WO1999DE00416
Priority number, dateDE199810658717.02.1998         Original published format: DE 19806587
[2000/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9942225
Date:26.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1054741
Date:29.11.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1054741
Date:02.05.2002
Language:DE
[2002/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:B07C1/02, B65H31/22
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/48]
TitleGerman:SORTIERANLAGE FÜR FLACHES POSTGUT[2000/48]
English:INSTALLATION FOR SORTING FLAT MAIL ARTICLES[2000/48]
French:INSTALLATION DE TRI POUR ENVOIS POSTAUX PLATS[2000/48]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2000National basic fee paid 
27.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.06.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
14.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2001Fee for grant paid
05.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9736805  (ELECTROCOM AUTOMATION LP [US]) [Y] 1,2 * page 33, line 19 - page 39, line 14 *;
 [Y]US5503388  (GUENTHER KENNETH [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 48; figure - *;
 [A]JPS63202560  ;
 [DA]WO9502467  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881216), vol. 012, no. 484, Database accession no. (M - 776), [A] 3 * abstract *