EP1058523 - AN IMPROVED MODULAR JOINT PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DE | published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De Wilde, Lieven Noendries 29 9000 Gent / BE | [2000/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Thivillier, Patrick Cabinet Laurent & Charras 3 Place de l'Hôtel de Ville B.P. 203 42005 Saint-Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/12] | Thivillier, Patrick Cabinet Laurent & Charras, 3 Place de l'Hôtel de Ville, B.P. 203 42005 Saint-Etienne Cédex 1 / FR | ||
Former [2000/50] | Bernasconi, Jean c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99913214.5 | 03.03.1999 | [2000/50] | WO1999EP01356 | Priority number, date | EP19980870043 | 03.03.1998 Original published format: EP 98870043 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944546 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058523 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1058523 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/40, A61F2/46 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
A61F2/40 (EP);
A61F2/4612 (EP);
A61F2/4657 (EP);
A61B17/06166 (EP);
A61B17/164 (EP);
A61B17/82 (EP);
A61B17/842 (EP);
A61F2/0811 (EP);
A61F2/4003 (EP);
A61F2/4059 (EP);
A61F2/4603 (EP);
A61F2002/2835 (EP);
A61F2002/30224 (EP);
A61F2002/30332 (EP);
A61F2002/30507 (EP);
A61F2002/30578 (EP);
A61F2002/30593 (EP);
A61F2002/30594 (EP);
A61F2002/30604 (EP);
A61F2002/30616 (EP);
A61F2002/30617 (EP);
A61F2002/30774 (EP);
A61F2002/30787 (EP);
A61F2002/30795 (EP);
A61F2002/30797 (EP);
A61F2002/3081 (EP);
A61F2002/30878 (EP);
A61F2002/4018 (EP);
A61F2002/4029 (EP);
A61F2002/4044 (EP);
A61F2002/4631 (EP);
A61F2002/4662 (EP);
A61F2220/0025 (EP);
A61F2220/0033 (EP);
A61F2230/0069 (EP);
A61F2250/0097 (EP);
A61F2310/00023 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/50] | Title | German: | MODULARE GELENKPROTHESE | [2000/50] | English: | AN IMPROVED MODULAR JOINT PROSTHESIS | [2000/50] | French: | PROTHESE MODULAIRE AMELIOREE DE L'ARTICULATION | [2000/50] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 27.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | deleted | [2005/32] |
Former [2002/11] | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Licencee: | DePuy France, Société Anonyme 7 allée Irène Joliot-Curie Saint-Priest 69801 / FR | ||
Date: | 01.12.2001 | ||
[2005/32] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 10.08.2005 | DE | 11.11.2005 | [2006/36] |
Former [2006/25] | BE | 10.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US3979778 (STROOT JEROME H) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 40 - line 48; figures 1,8,9 * [A] 3,6; | [YA]DE9312218U (HOWMEDICA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 * figure -; claims 1,6 * [A] 2-4,10; | [A]DE19548154 (SQ SERVICES AG [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0329854 (DINES DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * abstract *; | [A]EP0547369 (HOWMEDICA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3,4 * column 2, line 34 - line 53; figure - *; | [A]DE2702773 (STROOT JEROME H) [A] 1,3 * page 5, paragraphs 2-3; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US5064427 (BURKINSHAW BRIAN D [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |