Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994789

EP0994789 - DEVICE FOR FIXING A CHILD SEAT TO THE SEAT OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.10.2004
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.10.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.12.2004  [2004/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KEIPER GmbH & Co. KG
Hertelsbrunnenring 2
67657 Kaiserslautern / DE
[2003/38]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Keiper GmbH & Co.
Hertelsbrunnenring 2
67657 Kaiserslautern / DE
Inventor(s)01 / GOY, Reinhard
Donnersbergstrasse 177
D-67657 Kaiserslautern / DE
02 / LEBKÜCHER, Michael
Steinstrasse 21b
D-67678 Mehlingen/Baalborn / DE
03 / LIEDHEGENER, Ralf
Köhlerweg 3
D-67705 Trippstadt / DE
04 / REIMER, Peter
Oberer Wiesenrech 1
D-67229 Gro karlbach / DE
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Mentzel, Norbert , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse
Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel
Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig
Kleiner Werth 34
42275 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Mentzel, Norbert, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse, Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel, Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig, Kleiner Werth 34
42275 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date99913235.006.03.1999
[2000/17]
WO1999EP01454
Priority number, dateDE199812213416.05.1998         Original published format: DE 19822134
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9959837
Date:25.11.1999
Language:DE
[1999/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994789
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994789
Date:10.12.2003
Language:DE
[2003/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60N2/28
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/17]
TitleGerman:BEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN KINDERSITZ AUF EINEM FAHRZEUGSITZ[2000/17]
English:DEVICE FOR FIXING A CHILD SEAT TO THE SEAT OF A MOTOR VEHICLE[2000/17]
French:DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'UN SIEGE ENFANT SUR UN SIEGE DE VEHICULE[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase13.11.1999National basic fee paid 
13.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/17]
25.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2003Fee for grant paid
21.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE19650087  (FAURE BERTRAND SITZTECH GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0417394  (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR [DE]);
 [A]DE4427768  (SIDLER GMBH & CO [DE])
by applicantDE19650087