Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1066619

EP1066619 - BACKLIGHT CONTROL FOR A DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  31.05.2002
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2002Surcharge for renewal fee 
31.05.2002Renewal fee 
31.05.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 17.07.2002  [2002/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CENTRAL RESEARCH LABORATORIES LIMITED
Dawley Road Hayes
Middlesex, UB3 1HH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/02]For all designated states
CENTRAL RESEARCH LABORATORIES LIMITED
Dawley Road
Hayes, Middlesex, UB3 1HH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / SURGUY, Paul, Willam Herbert
147 Ryefield Avenue
Uxbridge, Middlesex UB10 9DA / GB
 [2001/02]
Representative(s)Leaman, Keith
QED I.P. Services Limited, Dawley Road Hayes
Middlesex UB3 1HH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/02]Leaman, Keith
QED I.P. Services Limited, Dawley Road
Hayes, Middlesex UB3 1HH / GB
Application number, filing date99913442.225.03.1999
[2001/02]
WO1999GB00934
Priority number, dateGB1998000659327.03.1998         Original published format: GB 9806593
[2001/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9950817
Date:07.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1066619
Date:10.01.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999
[2001/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/34
[2001/02]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL,   SE [2001/02]
TitleGerman:RÜCKBELEUCHTUNG FÜR EIN ANZEIGEGERÄT[2001/02]
English:BACKLIGHT CONTROL FOR A DISPLAY DEVICE[2001/02]
French:COMMANDE DE RETROECLAIRAGE POUR DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE[2001/02]
Entry into regional phase23.10.2000National basic fee paid 
23.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/02]
24.10.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.05.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200103   M06   Fee paid on   20.07.2001
31.03.200204   M06   Fee paid on   15.05.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]US5121233  (SPENCER GORDON R [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,11-13 * abstract * * column 5, line 63 - column 7, line 24 *;
 [XP]JPH10186311  ;
 [A]WO9619082  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-4,12,13 * page 6, line 12 - page 10, line 3 *
 [XP]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 098, no. 012, [XP] 1-4,6,12 * abstract *