Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992155

EP0992155 - DATA COMPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.12.2009
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.01.2010  [2010/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BAILLEUL, Nicolas
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Roche, Denis , et al
Société Civile SPID
33, rue de Verdun
92150 Suresnes / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/47]Roche, Denis , et al
Société Civile SPID 156, Boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2006/17]van Oudheusden-Perset, Laure E. , et al
Société Civile SPID 156, Boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2003/35]Charpail, François , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, 156 Boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/15]den Braber, Gerard Paul
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property, 156, Boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99913523.922.04.1999
[2000/15]
WO1999IB00724
Priority number, dateEP1998040105330.04.1998         Original published format: EP 98401053
EP1998040172107.07.1998         Original published format: EP 98401721
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9957884
Date:11.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992155
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE13.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/00
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/15]
TitleGerman:DATENKOMPRESSION[2000/15]
English:DATA COMPRESSION[2000/15]
French:COMPRESSION DE DONNEES[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase31.01.2000National basic fee paid 
31.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
31.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
13.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2009Invitation to provide information on prior art
28.07.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/02]
28.08.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: information on prior art not received in time  [2010/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
02.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200911   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9743859  (THOMSON MULTIMEDIA SA [FR], et al);
 [A]EP0540961  (IBM [US]);
 [X]EP0444918  (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP])