Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1118050

EP1118050 - MULTIPOINT DIGITAL TEMPERATURE CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.09.2006
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vasu Tech Limited
VT House A-25, New Friends Colony
New Delhi 110065 / IN
[2001/30]
Inventor(s)01 / BHATNAGAR, Rajiv
11 Golf Links Pali Hill, Khar
Mumbai 400052 Maharashtra / IN
 [2001/30]
Representative(s)Robson, Aidan John
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/30]Robson, Aidan John
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date99913562.715.03.1999
[2001/30]
WO1999IN00007
Priority number, dateINBO02979815.05.1998         Original published format: IN Bo029798
INBO02989815.05.1998         Original published format: IN Bo029898
[2001/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9960456
Date:25.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1118050
Date:25.07.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999
[2001/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1118050
Date:16.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G05D23/19
[2001/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/30]
TitleGerman:DIGITALER MEHRPUNKTTEMPERATURREGLER[2001/30]
English:MULTIPOINT DIGITAL TEMPERATURE CONTROLLER[2001/30]
French:CONTROLEUR DE TEMPERATURE NUMERIQUE MULTIPOINT[2001/30]
Entry into regional phase18.08.2000National basic fee paid 
18.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.08.2000Examination requested  [2001/30]
15.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/16]
08.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
deletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/33]
08.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/33]
15.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2005Fee for grant paid
15.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43]
Request for further processing for:08.06.2004Request for further processing filed
08.06.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.09.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200204   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.2002
31.03.200406   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2004
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
CY16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
ES27.02.2006
IE15.03.2006
FR31.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
PT17.04.2006
[2009/30]
Former [2009/02]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
CY16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
ES27.02.2006
IE15.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
PT17.04.2006
Former [2008/30]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
ES27.02.2006
IE15.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
PT17.04.2006
Former [2007/22]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
ES27.02.2006
IE15.03.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
PT17.04.2006
Former [2006/50]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
ES27.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
PT17.04.2006
Former [2006/49]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
PT17.04.2006
Former [2006/46]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2006/38]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
Former [2006/36]AT16.11.2005
BE16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
Former [2006/34]AT16.11.2005
CH16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
Former [2006/33]CH16.11.2005
LI16.11.2005
NL16.11.2005
Former [2006/24]NL16.11.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2056072  (DICON ELECTRONICS LTD);
 [X]US5682949  (RATCLIFFE EDWARD L [CA], et al);
 [Y]US4298946  (HARTSELL GLENN A, et al);
 [Y]US4388692  (JONES JAMES J, et al);
 [Y]GB1519401  (ESPOSITO A M, et al);
 [Y]US4836442  (BECKEY THOMAS J [US]);
 [A]WO9621282  (PSC INC [US]);
 [A]DE3038814  (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]);
 [A]SU1734083  (ANGARSKOE OK B AVTOMATIKI N PR [SU])
ExaminationEP0927919
 US5377128