Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1118050 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1118050



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 292
30.10.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
20.09.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
07.10.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.08.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.08.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 10
09.08.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 8
08.08.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.08.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 10
08.08.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 8
17.06.2005 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
13.06.2005 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 1
10.06.2005 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 1
15.02.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
15.02.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
15.02.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 41
13.10.2004 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.09.2004 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 2
30.06.2004 Claims Search / examination 4
30.06.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.06.2004 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
28.06.2004 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
08.06.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
08.06.2004 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
23.02.2004 Closing of application Search / examination 1
31.10.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
14.05.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
14.05.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.09.2002 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
26.09.2002 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
26.09.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.09.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.07.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
12.07.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.05.2002 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
15.03.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
15.03.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.06.2001 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.05.2001 Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant Search / examination 1
17.04.2001 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
13.03.2001 Invitation to pay administrative fee for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
03.01.2001 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
25.10.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
06.10.2000 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
21.08.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
18.08.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
14.08.2000 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
14.08.2000 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
10.08.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
09.08.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.08.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.08.2000 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
09.08.2000 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
09.08.2000 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
09.08.2000 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
09.08.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.08.2000 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.07.2000 Claims Search / examination 7
20.07.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
10.04.2000 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.04.2000 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
10.04.2000 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
02.03.2000 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.02.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.01.2000 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.01.2000 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
30.12.1999 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
30.12.1999 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.12.1999 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
22.12.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
09.12.1999 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.12.1999 Document concerning representation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
09.12.1999 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.12.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
02.12.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
02.12.1999 Priority document Search / examination 26
02.12.1999 Priority document Search / examination 24
25.11.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 42
25.11.1999 International search report (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3