Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1118050


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.06.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.07.2009  [2009/30]
05.12.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.01.2009  [2009/02]
20.06.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.07.2008  [2008/30]
21.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.04.2008  [2008/17]
27.04.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.05.2007  [2007/22]
10.11.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2006  [2006/50]
03.11.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2006  [2006/49]
13.10.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2006  [2006/46]
22.09.2006 No opposition filed within time limit published on  25.10.2006  [2006/43]
18.08.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2006  [2006/38]
04.08.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2006  [2006/36]
28.07.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.08.2006  [2006/35]
21.07.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.08.2006  [2006/34]
14.07.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.08.2006  [2006/33]
12.05.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.06.2006  [2006/24]
30.09.2005 (Expected) grant published on  16.11.2005  [2005/46]
25.08.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
25.08.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.04.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.02.2005 Change - extension states published on  30.03.2005  [2005/13]
09.02.2005 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.02.2005 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
05.02.2005 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
08.10.2004 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
08.10.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.09.2004 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
17.09.2004 Deletion: Receipt of request for further processing
17.09.2004 Deletion: Fee payment for request for further processing
17.09.2004 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
17.09.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
17.09.2004 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
17.09.2004 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
10.07.2004 Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
10.07.2004 Deletion: Receipt of request for further processing
10.07.2004 Deletion: Fee payment for request for further processing
10.07.2004 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
10.07.2004 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
10.07.2004 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
02.07.2004 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
25.06.2004 Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn published on  11.08.2004  [2004/33]
23.06.2004 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
22.06.2004 Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
22.06.2004 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
22.06.2004 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
27.02.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  14.04.2004  [2004/16]
25.10.2003 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
09.05.2003 Examination report or reply
21.03.2003 Renewal fee
02.10.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
02.10.2002 Renewal fee
30.09.2002 Examination report or reply
17.07.2002 Examination report or reply
30.04.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
15.03.2002 First examination report
13.03.2002 Examination report or reply
08.06.2001 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.07.2001 [2001/30]
08.06.2001 Request for examination filed published on  25.07.2001 [2001/30]
10.05.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
23.04.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
27.03.2001 Renewal fee
27.01.2001 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
03.03.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
02.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
30.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
11.05.1999 PCT data prior to European publication