Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992554

EP0992554 - RESIN COMPOSITIONS FOR COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.
2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8666 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.
2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8666 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KAGEISHI, Ichiji
Toure-Shataku 445, 3-1, Yuushudai-Higashi
Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0124 / JP
02 / OSANAI, Yoshitaka
Toure-Shinonomeryou 405, 1-3-1, Yuushudai-nishi
Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0124 / JP
03 / ANDO, Yumi
2-14-6, Tuganodai, Wakaba-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 264-0033 / JP
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Coleiro, Raymond , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
33 Gutter Lane
London EC2V 8AS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Coleiro, Raymond , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date99913714.419.04.1999
[2000/15]
WO1999JP02076
Priority number, dateJP1998010917820.04.1998         Original published format: JP 10917898
JP1999000688913.01.1999         Original published format: JP 688999
[2000/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9954417
Date:28.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992554
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.10.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:C09D163/00, C09D133/14, C09D183/06
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   NL [2000/15]
TitleGerman:HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR BESCHICHTUNGEN[2000/15]
English:RESIN COMPOSITIONS FOR COATINGS[2000/15]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE RESINE POUR REVETEMENTS[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase26.12.1999Translation filed 
10.01.2000National basic fee paid 
10.01.2000Search fee paid 
10.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
03.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/20]
11.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XP]EP0846739  (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-4 * page 2, line 15 - page 6, column 48 * * page 13, line 42 - page 23, line 58; example 28; claim -; table 11 *
International search[X]JPH09132752  (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD);
 [A]JPH04309574  (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD);
 [A]JPS53111336  (TORAY INDUSTRIES)