Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1098937

EP1098937 - A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING GRANULATED MASTIC ASPHALT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/20]A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING GRANULATED ASPHALT MASTIC, AND A SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCT FOR USE IN THE METHOD
[2002/10]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.12.2003
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.01.2004  [2004/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NCC Norge AS NCC Asfalt
Tegleverksveien 1, Lier PO Box 506
Brakeroeya, 3002 Drammen / NO
[2002/11]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
Rieber & Soen ASA
Nodest Asfalt, P.B. 506
Brakeroeya, 3002 Drammen / NO
Inventor(s)01 / WENTZEL, Jarle
Tors vei 5
N-3001 Drammen / NO
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Kyle, Diana
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Kyle, Diana
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date99913764.929.03.1999
[2001/20]
WO1999NO00104
Priority number, dateNO1998000149402.04.1998         Original published format: NO 981494
[2001/20]
Filing languageNO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9951678
Date:14.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1098937
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1098937
Date:05.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE14.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08L95/00, C09D195/00, C09J195/00
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2001/20]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GRANULIERTEM GUSSASPHALT[2002/10]
English:A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING GRANULATED MASTIC ASPHALT[2002/10]
French:PROCEDE POUR FABRIQUER UN MASTIC ASPHALTIQUE GRANULE[2002/10]
Former [2001/20]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GRANULIERTEM GUSSASPHALT UND EIN HALBFERTIGES PRODUKT ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DIESEM VERFAHREN
Former [2001/20]A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING GRANULATED ASPHALT MASTIC, AND A SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCT FOR USE IN THE METHOD
Former [2001/20]PROCEDE POUR FABRIQUER UN MASTIC ASPHALTIQUE GRANULE ET PRODUIT SEMI-FINI UTILISE DANS CE PROCEDE
Entry into regional phase14.10.1999Translation filed 
26.10.2000National basic fee paid 
26.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
26.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.10.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/20]
10.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2002Fee for grant paid
06.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]GB1494279  (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO);
 [A]WO9724410  (HESSELBERG HYDRO 1991 LTD [GB], et al)