Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1060179

EP1060179 - SUBSTITUTED AMINOMETHYL ISOXAZOLINE DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS ANTIMICROBIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.08.2002
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 16.10.2002  [2002/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY
301 Henrietta Street
Kalamazoo, Michigan 49001 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/51]For all designated states
PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY
301 Henrietta Street
Kalamazoo, Michigan 49001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BARBACHYN, Michael, R.
1500 E. Kilgore Road
Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US
02 / MORRIS, Joel
3001 Applelane
Kalamazoo, MI 49008 / US
03 / WISHKA, Donn, G.
1431 Northampton Road
Kalamazoo, MI 49006 / US
04 / THOMAS, Richard, C.
2166 Wild Cherry Lane
Kalamazoo, MI 49009 / US
05 / GRABER, David, R.
3604 Woodcliff Drive
Kalamazoo, MI 49008 / US
[2000/51]
Representative(s)Perry, Robert Edward , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/51]Perry, Robert Edward , et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99913819.110.02.1999
[2000/51]
WO1999US04262
Priority number, dateUS19980075914P25.02.1998         Original published format: US 75914 P
[2000/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9943671
Date:02.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1060179
Date:20.12.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999
[2000/51]
Search report(s)International search reportEP02.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07D413/14, A61K31/42, C07D413/10, C07D491/04
[2000/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/51]
Extension statesAL13.09.2000
LT13.09.2000
LV13.09.2000
MK13.09.2000
RO13.09.2000
SI13.09.2000
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTE AMINOMETHYL ISOXAZOLIN DERIVATE VERWENDBAR ALS ANTIMIKROBIELLE MITTEL[2000/51]
English:SUBSTITUTED AMINOMETHYL ISOXAZOLINE DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS ANTIMICROBIALS[2000/51]
French:DERIVES D'ISOXAZOLINE AMINOMETHYLE SUBSTITUES UTILES EN TANT QU'AGENTS ANTIMICROBIENS[2000/51]
Entry into regional phase13.09.2000National basic fee paid 
13.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
21.08.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[AD]US4283403  (DAVENPORT JAMES D) [AD] 1-22 * column 1 - column 2 *;
 [AD]US3769295  (HOYLE W, et al) [AD] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2100242  (MERCK & CO INC.) [A] 1-22 * claims 1,4 *;
 [AD]WO9623788  (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [AD] 1-22 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0785200  (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-22 * claim 1 *;
 [PX]WO9807708  (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO9854161  (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-22 * the whole document *