Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1064550

EP1064550 - AN EQUINE $i(NEOSPORA) ISOLATE AND ITS USES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor
Oakland, CA 94607 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/01]For all designated states
THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA
12th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street
Oakland, California 94607-5200 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MARSH, Antoinette, E.
P.O. Box 1794
Columbia, MO 65205-1794 / US
02 / CONRAD, Patricia, A. Dept.of Pathl. Microbio.&
Immunology, University of California, Davis,2075
Haring Hall, Davis CA 95616 / US
03 / BARR, Bradd, C.
2911 Avila Bay Place
Davis, CA 95616 / US
 [2001/09]
Former [2001/01]01 / MARSH, Antoinette, E.
P.O. Box 1794
Columbia, MO 65205-1794 / US
02 / CONRAD, Patricia, A.
3217 Breton Avenue
Davis, CA 95616 / US
03 / BARR, Bradd, C.
2911 Avila Bay Place
Davis, CA 95616 / US
Representative(s)Sexton, Jane Helen , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/23]Sexton, Jane Helen , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2001/01]Goldin, Douglas Michael
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date99913906.616.03.1999
[2001/01]
WO1999US05754
Priority number, dateUS1998004260016.03.1998         Original published format: US 42600
[2001/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9947927
Date:23.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1064550
Date:03.01.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999
[2001/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.09.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/53, C12N5/00, C07K16/00
[2001/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/01]
TitleGerman:EIN $i(NEOSPORA)-ISOLAT AUS PFERDEN UND SEINE ANWENDUNG[2001/01]
English:AN EQUINE $i(NEOSPORA) ISOLATE AND ITS USES[2001/01]
French:ISOLAT DE $i(NEOSPORA) EQUIN ET SES APPLICATIONS[2001/01]
Entry into regional phase18.09.2000National basic fee paid 
18.09.2000Search fee paid 
18.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.09.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
25.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.07.2006
22.06.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.07.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
03.10.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/18]
08.11.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200608   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[PX]  MARSH ANTOINETTE E ET AL, "Description of a new Neospora species (Protozoa: Apicomplexa: Sarcocystidae).", JOURNAL OF PARASITOLOGY, (199810), vol. 84, no. 5, ISSN 0022-3395, pages 983 - 991, XP001095056 [PX] 1-30 * abstract * * page 984 *
 [X]  MARSH A E ET AL, "NEOSPOROSIS AS A CAUSE OF EQUINE PROTOZOAL MYELOENCEPHALITIS", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN VETERINARY MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, XX, XX, (199612), vol. 209, no. 11, ISSN 0003-1488, pages 1907 - 1913, XP002925677 [X] 1-30 * the whole document *
 [X]  BASZLER T V ET AL, "SEROLOGICAL DIAGNOSIS OF BOVINE NEOSPOROSIS BY NEOSPORA CANINUM MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY-BASED COMPETITIVE INHIBITION ENZYME-LINKED IMMUNOSORBENT ASSAY", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199606), vol. 34, no. 6, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 1423 - 1428, XP000943506 [X] 14-18 * abstract *
 [X]  HO M S ET AL, "Detection of Neospora from tissues of experimentally infected rhesus macaques by PCR and specific DNA probe hybridization.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY. UNITED STATES JUL 1997, (199707), vol. 35, no. 7, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 1740 - 1745, XP002209946 [X] 21-24 * abstract *
International search[X]US5707617  (CONRAD PATRICIA A [US], et al);
 [XE]US5889166  (CONRAD PATRICIA A [US], et al)