EP1119453 - HIGH SPEED PAPER FOLDING MACHINE AND RELATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/31] | HIGH SPEED PAPER FOLDING MACHINE | ||
[2009/10] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Specialty Systems Advanced Machinery, Inc. South Front Street, P.O. Box 536 Iron River, WI 54847-0536 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Specialty Systems Advanced Machinery, Inc. South Front Street, P.O. Box 536 Iron River, WI 54847-0536 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ST. GERMAIN, Patrick, C. R.R. 2, Box 100B Iron River, WI 54847 / US | 02 /
WICKMAN, Vernon, C. R.R. 1, Box 65 Port Wing, WI 54865 / US | [2009/16] |
Former [2001/31] | 01 /
ST. GERMAIN, Patrick, C. R.R. , Box 100B Iron River, WI 54847 / US | ||
02 /
WICKMAN, Vernon, C. R.R. 1, Box 65 Port Wing, WI 54865 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius, Volker, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | Vossius, Volker, Dr., et al Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei - Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Holbeinstrasse 5 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99914024.7 | 19.03.1999 | [2001/31] | WO1999US06175 | Priority number, date | US19980045754 | 20.03.1998 Original published format: US 45754 | [2001/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9947348 | Date: | 23.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1119453 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/16, B65H45/28 | [2007/03] | CPC: |
B65H45/165 (EP,US);
B65H45/167 (EP,US);
B65H45/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/31] | B31F5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2001/31] | Title | German: | MASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUM FALTEN VON PAPIER MIT HOHER GESCHWINDIGKEIT | [2009/10] | English: | HIGH SPEED PAPER FOLDING MACHINE AND RELATED METHOD | [2009/10] | French: | MACHINE ET METHODE A PLIER LE PAPIER A GRANDE VITESSE | [2009/10] |
Former [2001/31] | MIT HOHER GESCHWINDIGKEIT ARBEITENDE MASCHINE ZUM FALTEN VON PAPIER | ||
Former [2001/31] | HIGH SPEED PAPER FOLDING MACHINE | ||
Former [2001/31] | MACHINE A PLIER LE PAPIER A GRANDE VITESSE | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 22.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/03] | 02.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2008 | 31.03.2009 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3870292 (BRADLEY JOHN J) [X] 1,2,6,19 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 57; figures 3-6 * [Y] 3-5,7-18,20-35; | [Y]EP0302031 (PERINI FINANZIARIA SPA [IT]) [Y] 3-5 * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 40; figure 1 *; | [YX]GB2078684 (KOMORI PRINTING MACH) [Y] 3-5,7-18,20-35 * page 7, line 23 - page 8, line 32; figures 14,16 * [X] 36; | [X]DE4316134 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 25 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 61 *; | [A]JPH0524737 (ISHIZU SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1-36 * the whole document *; | [A]CH677640 (PERINI FINANZIARIA SPA) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US3870292 (BRADLEY JOHN J); | [Y]US4519597 (DESANTO RONALD F [US]); | [Y]US5004451 (PRUEM SEBASTIAN [DE]); | [Y]US3758102 (MUNN R, et al); | [Y]US3640522 (OELMANN PETER, et al); | [Y]US4790804 (GOTOU TOYOKICHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5000729 (YAMAUCHI SACHIO [JP]); | [Y]US2137978 (JOSEPH MILLS THOMAS, et al); | [Y]US2703238 (HAND LESLIE T); | [Y]US2328814 (ALFRED LAUKHUFF) |