Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1076673

EP1076673 - BRANCHED POLYCARBONATE PRODUCED BY REACTIVE EXTRUSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.09.2009  [2009/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/08]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MESTANZA, Raphael
20, rue des Eglsutiers
F-57110 Kuntzig / FR
02 / HOEKS, Theodorus, Lambertus
Halsterseweg 303
NL-4613 AS Bergen op Zoom / NL
03 / DE BONT, Johannes, Joachim
Molensingel 27
NL-4724 CK Wouw / NL
 [2001/08]
Representative(s)Szary, Anne Catherine , et al
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]Szary, Anne Catherine , et al
London Patent Operation GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London
WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2001/08]Szary, Anne Catherine, Dr. , et al
GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date99914101.324.03.1999
[2001/08]
WO1999US06434
Priority number, dateUS1998005334801.04.1998         Original published format: US 53348
[2001/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9950336
Date:07.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1076673
Date:21.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999
[2001/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1076673
Date:03.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08G64/14, C08G64/42
[2001/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/08]
TitleGerman:VERZWEIGTE POLYCARBONATE HERGESTELLT DURCH REAKTIVE EXTRUSION[2001/08]
English:BRANCHED POLYCARBONATE PRODUCED BY REACTIVE EXTRUSION[2001/08]
French:POLYCARBONATE RAMIFIE PRODUIT PAR EXTRUSION REACTIVE[2001/08]
Entry into regional phase02.11.2000National basic fee paid 
02.11.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/08]
13.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2003Fee for grant paid
22.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
CY03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
FR03.03.2004
IT03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
LU24.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GB03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
PT03.08.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/22]AT03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
CY03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
FR03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
LU24.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GB03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2006/14]AT03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
FR03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
LU24.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GB03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/45]AT03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
LU24.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GB03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/24]AT03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
LU24.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/23]AT03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
LU24.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/18]AT03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/05]AT03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/02]AT03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2004/46]AT03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2004/44]AT03.03.2004
CH03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
LI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2004/43]AT03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI03.03.2004
SE03.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0708130  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,2,6-8 * claims 1,2,4 *;
 [A]WO9419390  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8 * claims 13,17,18,22,23 *