Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995223

EP0995223 - LOW-PRESSURE MERCURY-VAPOR DISCHARGE LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.07.2004
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.09.2004  [2004/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / DENISSEN, Cornelis, J., M.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / RONDA, Cornelis, R.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / VAN KEMENADE, Wilhelmus, M., P.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
04 / GUBBELS, Henricus, P., M.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date99914706.929.04.1999
[2000/17]
WO1999IB00774
Priority number, dateEP1998020154808.05.1998         Original published format: EP 98201548
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9959189
Date:18.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995223
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995223
Date:24.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01J61/10
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/17]
TitleGerman:NIEDERDRUCKQUECKSILBERDAMPFENTLADUNGSLAMPE[2000/17]
English:LOW-PRESSURE MERCURY-VAPOR DISCHARGE LAMP[2000/17]
French:LAMPE A DECHARGE A VAPEUR DE MERCURE A BASSE PRESSION[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase08.02.2000National basic fee paid 
08.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
15.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.2003Fee for grant paid
25.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL24.09.2003
[2004/33]
Cited inInternational search[A]DE1060991  (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH);
 [A]SU972613
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 37, Database accession no. 1983-763663/37, & SU972613 A 19821107 (SIMAKIN A G)