blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0993652 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0993652



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 172
16.08.2007 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
14.09.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.08.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.08.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
03.08.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
12.04.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
12.04.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
12.04.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
01.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 9
01.03.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
01.03.2006 Description Search / examination 5
01.03.2006 Description Search / examination 5
01.03.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
24.02.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 26
24.01.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.01.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 8
25.10.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
25.10.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.12.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 28
19.11.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
11.11.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
11.11.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 26