blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0993652


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.04.2008  [2008/17]
14.09.2007 No opposition filed within time limit published on  17.10.2007  [2007/42]
29.06.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2007  [2007/31]
27.04.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.05.2007  [2007/22]
08.09.2006 (Expected) grant published on  11.10.2006  [2006/41]
31.08.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
31.08.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
09.05.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.04.2006 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.02.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.01.2006 Change - representative published on  08.03.2006  [2006/10]
21.10.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.05.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.05.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.05.2003 Renewal fee
21.05.2002 Renewal fee
15.05.2001 Renewal fee
19.05.2000 Request for examination filed published on  05.07.2000 [2000/27]
03.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
02.03.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
22.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
17.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
21.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
16.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
19.05.1999 PCT data prior to European publication