blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0993652
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4212659BGlobal Dossier 21.01.2009B2
JP2002511972 16.04.2002A
Priority number Date
EP98890127 05.05.1998
IB9900780 29.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0993652Global Dossier 11.10.2006B1
EP0993652 19.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP99914712 29.04.1999
EP98890127 05.05.1998
IB9900780 29.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69933520T 21.06.2007T2
DE69933520D 23.11.2006D1
Priority number Date
EP98890127 05.05.1998
IB9900780 29.04.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9957681Global Dossier 11.11.1999A1
Priority number Date
EP98890127 05.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT342553T 15.11.2006T
Priority number Date
EP98890127 05.05.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6304613 16.10.2001B1
Priority number Date
EP98890127 05.05.1998