blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0993652

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 11.10.2006
 DE 
 ESLapse: 22.01.2007
 FR 
 GB 
 ITLapse: 11.10.2006
Examination procedure22.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase07.02.2000National basic fee paid 
07.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
European patent granted11.10.2006
Opposition procedure12.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit published on 17.10.2007 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT DE ES FR GB IT
 
Event date:05.07.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000511
 
Event date:11.10.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20061011
 
Event date:11.10.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20061011
 
Event date:11.10.2006 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT DE ES FR GB IT
 
Event date:11.10.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:23.11.2006 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69933520
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20061123
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:03.01.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
 
Event date:22.01.2007 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20070122
 
Event date:20.04.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
 
Event date:18.05.2007 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:17.10.2007 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20070712
 
Event date:28.08.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR GC
Code Expl.: LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED
 
Event date:02.09.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR GC
Code Expl.: LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED
 
Event date:09.03.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR AU
Code Expl.: OTHER ACT AFFECTING THE OWNERSHIP OR EXPLOITATION OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT
Effective DATE:20120126
 
Event date:09.11.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR AU
Code Expl.: OTHER ACT AFFECTING THE OWNERSHIP OR EXPLOITATION OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT
Effective DATE:20121009
 
Event date:03.05.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR AU
Code Expl.: OTHER ACT AFFECTING THE OWNERSHIP OR EXPLOITATION OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT
Effective DATE:20130402
 
Event date:03.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130606 AND 20130612
 
Event date:21.02.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR RG
Code Expl.: LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED
Effective DATE:20140115
 
Event date:16.07.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140619 AND 20140625
 
Event date:13.01.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 69933520 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BARDEHLE PAGENBERG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB PATENTANW, DE
 
Event date:23.01.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
Owner Name:QUOTAINNE ENTERPRISES LLC, US
Effective DATE:20141224
 
Event date:19.02.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 69933520 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:QUOTAINNE ENTERPRISES LLC, WILMINGTON, US
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: NXP B.V., EINDHOVEN, NL
Effective DATE:20150113
 
Event date:19.02.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 69933520 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:BARDEHLE PAGENBERG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB PATENTANW, DE
Effective DATE:20150113
 
Event date:09.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:13.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:15.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20180329
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.05.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20180315
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20180417
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.04.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69933520 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:15.05.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20190428