Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993652

EP0993652 - DATA CARRIER HAVING RECTIFIER MEANS AND HAVING IMPROVED VOLTAGE LIMITING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2006/41]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / KOLLER, Manfred
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / THÜRINGER, Peter
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Wieser, Stefan , et al
Philips Austria GmbH
Intellectual Property & Standards
Triester Strasse 64
1101 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2006/10]Wieser, Stefan , et al
Philips Austria GmbH, Intellectual Property & Standards Triester Strasse 64
1101 Wien / AT
Former [2000/16]Weber, Helmut
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property Triester Strasse 64
1101 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date99914712.729.04.1999
[2000/16]
WO1999IB00780
Priority number, dateEP1998089012705.05.1998         Original published format: EP 98890127
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9957681
Date:11.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993652
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993652
Date:11.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE11.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/07, G06K7/08
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/16]
TitleGerman:DATENTRÄGER MIT KORREKTURMÖGLICHKEITEN UND VERBESSERTER SPANNUNGSBEGRENZUNGSMÖGLICHKEIT[2000/16]
English:DATA CARRIER HAVING RECTIFIER MEANS AND HAVING IMPROVED VOLTAGE LIMITING MEANS[2000/16]
French:PORTEUSE DE DONNEES POSSEDANT DES MOYENS DE REDRESSEMENT ET DES MOYENS AMELIORES DE LIMITATION DE TENSION[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase07.02.2000National basic fee paid 
07.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
25.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2006Fee for grant paid
22.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.10.2006
IT11.10.2006
ES22.01.2007
[2008/17]
Former [2007/31]AT11.10.2006
ES22.01.2007
Former [2007/22]ES22.01.2007
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9638814  ;
 [A]EP0732663  ;
 [AP]US5874829  ;
 [A]US5479172