Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993754

EP0993754 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING COMMON CHANNEL MESSAGE IN CDMA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.06.2006  [2006/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong
Paldal-gu
Suwon City, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon City, Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / JUNG, Ki-Sung c/o Samsung El.Co., Ltd. Patent Team
Samsung Plaza, 9th floor Seo-Hyun dong, Pundang gu
Seong-Namshi Kyungki-do, 463-050 / KR
02 / MOON, Hi, Chan
391, Pungnap-dong Songpa-gu
Seoul 138-040 / KR
03 / LEE, Hyun Suk, Jugong Apt. 4-danji
420-106, Chamshil 3-dong Songpa-gu
Seoul 138-790 / KR
04 / AHN, Jae Min c/o Samsung El.Co., Ltd. Patent Team
Samsung Plaza, 9th floor Seo-Hyun dong, Pundang gu
Seong-Nam shi Kyungki-do, 463-050 / KR
[2000/26]
Former [2000/16]01 / JUNG, Ki, Sung
404-2, Gukal-ri Kihung-up
Yongin-shi Kyonggi-do 449-900 / KR
02 / MOON, Hi, Chan
391, Pungnap-dong Songpa-gu
Seoul 138-040 / KR
03 / LEE, Hyun Suk, Jugong Apt. 4-danji
420-106, Chamshil 3-dong Songpa-gu
Seoul 138-790 / KR
04 / AHN, Jae Min, Puleunsamho Apt.
109-303, Irwonpon-dong Kangnam-gu
Seoul 135-239 / KR
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/32]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/16]Eisenführ, Günther, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner, Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date99914785.313.04.1999
[2000/16]
WO1999KR00175
Priority number, dateKR1913001499813.04.1998         Original published format: KR 1314998
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9953710
Date:21.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993754
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993754
Date:06.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT21.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38, H04B7/216
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERMITTLUNG EINER COMMON-CHANNEL-NACHRICHT IN EINEM CDMA-KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2000/16]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING COMMON CHANNEL MESSAGE IN CDMA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2000/16]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'EMISSION D'UN MESSAGE DE CANAL COMMUN DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION AMDC[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase13.01.2000National basic fee paid 
13.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/25]
12.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2005Fee for grant paid
12.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0765096  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]);
 [A]WO9746033  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al);
 [A]US5508708  (GHOSH AMITAVA [US], et al);
 [A]WO9747094  (QUALCOMM INC [US])