blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1064626

EP1064626 - A VEHICLE PARKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.09.2009
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MODUL-SYSTEM SWEDEN AB
Veddestavägen 17
175 62 Järfälla / SE
[2001/01]
Inventor(s)01 / HJELMVIK, Torbernt
Orionvägen 20
S-175 60 Järfälla / SE
[2001/01]
Representative(s)Örtenblad, Bertil Tore, et al
Noréns Patentbyra AB
P.O. Box 10198
100 55 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2001/01]Örtenblad, Bertil Tore, et al
Noréns Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 10198
100 55 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date99914837.217.03.1999
[2001/01]
WO1999SE00420
Priority number, dateSE1998000088817.03.1998         Original published format: SE 9800888
[2001/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9948062
Date:23.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1064626
Date:03.01.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1064626
Date:29.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE23.09.1999
ClassificationIPC:G07F7/00, H04M3/42, // (G07C1/30, G07F17:24)
[2001/01]
CPC:
G07F7/0866 (EP,US); G06Q20/363 (EP,US); G07B15/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/01]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUM PARKEN VON FAHRZEUGEN[2001/01]
English:A VEHICLE PARKING SYSTEM[2001/01]
French:SYSTEME DE STATIONNEMENT D'UN VEHICULE[2001/01]
Entry into regional phase22.08.2000National basic fee paid 
22.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
25.08.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
17.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2003Date of oral proceedings
25.07.2003Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.08.2003Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
24.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2008Fee for grant paid
13.08.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination14.10.2003Appeal received No.  T0387/04
23.12.2003Statement of grounds filed
17.12.2007Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Opposition(s)30.07.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
23.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
24.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
23.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
CY29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
IT29.10.2008
SE29.01.2009
GR30.01.2009
ES09.02.2009
LU17.03.2009
PT30.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/25]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
IT29.10.2008
SE29.01.2009
GR30.01.2009
ES09.02.2009
LU17.03.2009
PT30.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/19]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
IT29.10.2008
SE29.01.2009
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/06]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
IT29.10.2008
SE29.01.2009
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2009/32]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
Former [2009/30]AT29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
Former [2009/20]ES09.02.2009
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9611453  (PARKIT OY [FI], et al);
 [Y]WO9719568  (VAZVAN BEHRUZ [FI]);
 [Y]WO9735283  (MODUL ELEKTRONIK AB [SE], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.