Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1076806

EP1076806 - ATHLETE'S GPS-BASED PERFORMANCE MONITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.07.2005
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sportbug.Com, Inc.
Suite 417, 800 Airport Blvd.
Burlingame, CA 94010-1928 / US
[2001/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Root, Gary Miller
94 Birch Ave.
Corte Madera, CA 94925-1053 / US
02 / Van Hoorn, Frank
30 Sunrise Avenue
Mill Valey, CA 94941 / US
 [2001/08]
Representative(s)Raffnsoee, Knud Rosenstand , et al
Awapatent A/S
Rigensgade 11
1316 Copenhagen K / DK
[N/P]
Former [2001/08]Raffnsöe, Knud Rosenstand , et al
Internationalt Patent-Bureau, 23 Höje Taastrup Boulevard
2630 Taastrup / DK
Application number, filing date99914883.626.03.1999
[2001/08]
WO1999US04273
Priority number, dateUS1998004821426.03.1998         Original published format: US 48214
[2001/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9949279
Date:30.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1076806
Date:21.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1999
[2001/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1076806
Date:22.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.09.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01B21/00, G01C22/00, A63B24/00
[2001/29]
Former International [2001/08]G01B21/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/08]
TitleGerman:GPS-BASIERTE KONTROLLE DER LEISTUNGEN EINES LEICHTATHLETEN[2001/08]
English:ATHLETE'S GPS-BASED PERFORMANCE MONITOR[2001/08]
French:DISPOSITIF SERVANT A CONTROLER LES PERFORMANCES D'UN ATHLETE ET BASE SUR LE SYSTEME GPS[2001/08]
Entry into regional phase17.10.2000National basic fee paid 
17.10.2000Search fee paid 
17.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/08]
12.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2004Fee for grant paid
16.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
03.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200305   M06   Fee paid on   03.04.2003
31.03.200406   M06   Fee paid on   02.04.2004
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.09.2004
BE22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
ES22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
PT22.02.2005
CY26.03.2005
LU26.03.2005
IE28.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
[2008/17]
Former [2007/26]AT22.09.2004
BE22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
ES22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
CY26.03.2005
LU26.03.2005
IE28.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2007/22]AT22.09.2004
BE22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
ES22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
CY26.03.2005
IE28.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/24]AT22.09.2004
BE22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
IE28.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
Former [2006/14]AT22.09.2004
BE22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
NL22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
MC31.03.2005
Former [2005/46]AT22.09.2004
BE22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
DK22.12.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/28]AT22.09.2004
BE22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/21]AT22.09.2004
CH22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
LI22.09.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/18]AT22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
GR22.12.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/13]AT22.09.2004
FI22.09.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/11]FI22.09.2004
SE22.12.2004
Former [2005/10]SE22.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5438518  (BIANCO JOSEPH A [US], et al) [Y] 1,8 * column 5, line 29 - column 5, line 36 * * column 6, line 24 - column 6, line 63; figures 1-11 *;
 [Y]US5470233  (FRUCHTERMAN JAMES R [US], et al) [Y] 1,8 * column 12, line 39 - column 12, line 67; figures 1-8 *
International search[AP]US5825327  (KRASNER NORMAN F [US]);
 [AP]US5757929  (WANG WEIJIA [US], et al);
 [A]US5592401  (KRAMER JAMES F [US]);
 [A]US5148002  (KUO DAVID D [US], et al)
ExaminationUS5810680
 WO9904043