Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1075754

EP1075754 - TARIFF MANAGEMENT APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR MULTIPLE-MODE COMMUNICATIONS TERMINALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.11.2008
Database last updated on 25.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ericsson Inc.
6300 Legacy Drive MS EVW 2-C-2
Plano, TX 75024 / US
[2008/04]
Former [2004/02]For all designated states
Ericsson Inc.
6300 Legacy, MS EVW 2-C-2
Plano, TX 75024 / US
Former [2001/07]For all designated states
ERICSSON INC.
7001 Development Drive, P.O. Box 13969
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DENT, Paul, Wilkinson
637 Eagle Point Road
Pittsboro, NC 27312 / US
02 / HUMPHREYS, Elizabeth, Louise
637 Eagle Point Road
Pittsboro, NC 27312 / US
 [2001/07]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/07]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99915122.830.03.1999
[2001/07]
WO1999US06916
Priority number, dateUS1998007028930.04.1998         Original published format: US 70289
[2001/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9957882
Date:11.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1075754
Date:14.02.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999
[2001/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1075754
Date:23.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04M15/30, H04Q7/38
[2001/07]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   PT,   SE [2001/07]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG FÜR TARIFVERWALTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR KOMMUNIKATION IN MEHRFACH-BETRIEBSART[2001/07]
English:TARIFF MANAGEMENT APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR MULTIPLE-MODE COMMUNICATIONS TERMINALS[2001/07]
French:APPAREIL DE GESTION DE TARIFS ET PROCEDES POUR TERMINAUX DE COMMUNICATION A MODES MULTIPLES[2001/07]
Entry into regional phase26.10.2000National basic fee paid 
26.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
26.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/07]
23.08.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.2007Fee for grant paid
07.12.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.10.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE23.01.2008
FI23.01.2008
IT23.01.2008
SE23.04.2008
DE24.04.2008
GR24.04.2008
ES04.05.2008
PT23.06.2008
[2011/25]
Former [2010/06]BE23.01.2008
FI23.01.2008
IT23.01.2008
SE23.04.2008
DE24.04.2008
ES04.05.2008
PT23.06.2008
Former [2009/12]BE23.01.2008
FI23.01.2008
SE23.04.2008
DE24.04.2008
ES04.05.2008
PT23.06.2008
Former [2008/46]BE23.01.2008
FI23.01.2008
SE23.04.2008
ES04.05.2008
PT23.06.2008
Former [2008/43]BE23.01.2008
FI23.01.2008
ES04.05.2008
PT23.06.2008
Former [2008/42]FI23.01.2008
ES04.05.2008
PT23.06.2008
Former [2008/39]FI23.01.2008
ES04.05.2008
Former [2008/35]ES04.05.2008
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO9858512  (ROLM SYSTEMS [US], et al) [PX] 1-14,19-32,37-50 * page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 4 * * page 12, line 6 - page 14, line 3 * * page 16, line 9 - page 18, line 3 *;
 [X]WO9628947  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,13-15,19-22,24,25,31-33,37-40,42,43,49-51 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 35 * * page 6, line 6 - line 17 * * page 8, line 33 - page 9, line 34 * * page 15, line 6 - line 30 * * page 16, line 21 - page 17, line 13 *;
 [X]EP0724371  (CABLE & WIRELESS PLC [GB]) [X] 1-5,13-15,19-23,31-33,37-41,49-51 * page 1, line 1 - line 29 * * page 4, line 3 - line 38 *;
 [X]EP0808073  (MOTOROLA LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,19-21,37-39 * column 3, line 31 - line 52 *;
 [A]WO9624226  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 4,5,22,23,40,41 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 18 *;
 [A]WO9428683  (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [A] 1-3,19-21,37-39 * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 19 *