blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1080052

EP1080052 - METHOD FOR MAKING ABRASIVE GRAIN USING IMPREGNATION, AND ABRASIVE ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.08.2003
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/10]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WOOD, William, P.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2001/10]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99915150.931.03.1999
[2001/10]
WO1999US07059
Priority number, dateUS1998008136519.05.1998         Original published format: US 81365
[2001/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9961389
Date:02.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1080052
Date:07.03.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1080052
Date:16.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/42]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1080052
Date:02.01.2003
[2003/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:C04B35/111, C09K3/14
[2001/10]
CPC:
C01F7/023 (EP,US); C04B35/1115 (EP,US); C09K3/1409 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/10]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SCHLEIFKÖRNERN DURCH IMPRÄGNIEREN UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE SCHLEIFMITTEL[2001/10]
English:METHOD FOR MAKING ABRASIVE GRAIN USING IMPREGNATION, AND ABRASIVE ARTICLES[2001/10]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE GRAIN ABRASIF PAR IMPREGNATION, ET ARTICLES ABRASIFS[2001/10]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2000National basic fee paid 
19.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/10]
28.02.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
29.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
29.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.2002Fee for grant paid
09.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9812151  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [DA] 1,5,6,10,11,18,22-37* claims 1-7,14-18,21,29-32 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.