blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0991983 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0991983



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 158
22.03.2011 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
21.05.2003 Closing of application Search / examination 1
06.02.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
04.06.2002 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
28.03.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
18.03.2002 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 3
01.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.12.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.11.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
25.11.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 1
25.11.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
03.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 38
28.10.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
21.10.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
21.10.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 50
29.07.1999 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
04.05.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
04.05.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 5
04.05.1999 Description International Searching Authority 23
04.05.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 14