blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0991983


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.05.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  09.07.2003  [2003/28]
04.02.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn
31.05.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
28.03.2002 Change - applicant published on  15.05.2002  [2002/20]
10.05.2001 Renewal fee
14.04.2000 Request for examination filed published on  31.05.2000 [2000/22]
25.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
08.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
07.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
09.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
27.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
22.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
29.07.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
19.05.1999 PCT data prior to European publication