blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0991983
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002505766Global Dossier 19.02.2002A
Priority number Date
US6086598 15.04.1998
US9907631 07.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0991983Global Dossier 12.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
US6086598 15.04.1998
US9907631 07.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU3386599 01.11.1999A
Priority number Date
US6086598 15.04.1998
US9907631 07.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2292572 21.10.1999A1
Priority number Date
US6086598 15.04.1998
US9907631 07.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL133421D 30.04.2001D0
Priority number Date
US6086598 15.04.1998
US9907631 07.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6107009 22.08.2000A
Priority number Date
US37247199 11.08.1999
US6086598 15.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6200736 13.03.2001B1
Priority number Date
US37247199 11.08.1999
US6086598 15.04.1998
US49672800 02.02.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9953381Global Dossier 21.10.1999A1
Priority number Date
US6086598 15.04.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20010013818 26.02.2001A
Priority number Date
US6086598 15.04.1998