blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0991983

Designated contracting statesDE 
GB 
NL 
Examination procedure06.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/28]
Entry into regional phase25.11.1999National basic fee paid 
25.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200204   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE GB NL
 
Event date:31.05.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000403
 
Event date:15.05.2002 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:APPLIED MATERIALS, INC.
 
Event date:09.07.2003 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20021205