Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991983

EP0991983 - PHOTORESIST DEVELOPER AND METHOD OF DEVELOPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.05.2003
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.07.2003  [2003/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
3050 Bowers Avenue
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/20]For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
3050 Bowers Avenue
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Etec Systems, Inc.
26460 Corporate Avenue
Hayward, CA 94545 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TAN, Zoilo, Cheng, Ho
10630 Madrid Road
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99915321.607.04.1999
[2000/15]
WO1999US07631
Priority number, dateUS1998006086515.04.1998         Original published format: US 60865
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9953381
Date:21.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991983
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/32
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   NL [2000/15]
TitleGerman:FOTORESISTENTWICKLER UND ENTWICKLUNGSVERFAHREN[2000/15]
English:PHOTORESIST DEVELOPER AND METHOD OF DEVELOPMENT[2000/15]
French:DEVELOPPATEUR DE PHOTORESERVE ET PROCEDE DE DEVELOPPEMENT[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase25.11.1999National basic fee paid 
25.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
05.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/28]
06.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5130226  (SAMPEI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,9 * column 61, line 32 - line 34 * * column 66, line 10 - line 18 *;
 [X]US5292445  (FJARE DOUGLAS E [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6 * column 18, line 55 - line 59 *;
 [AD]EP0286272  (THIOKOL MORTON INC [US]) [AD] 1-25 * page 9, line 23 - line 25 * * page 16, line 25 - line 46 *;
 [A]JPH02151866
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 29, Database accession no. 90-221877, XP002109635 & JPH02151866 A 19900611 (MACDERMID INC) [A] 1-25 * abstract *