Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1064543

EP1064543 - THIN-LAYER CHROMATOGRAPHY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB
published on 13.11.2013  [2013/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Spangenberg, Bernd
Am Rittweg 10
77654 Offenburg / DE
[2001/01]
Inventor(s)01 / SPANGENBERG, Bernd
Am Rittweg 10
D-77654 Offenburg / DE
02 / KLEIN, Karl-Friedrich
Allmendstrasse 35
D-61169 Friedberg / DE
[2001/01]
Representative(s)Pietruk, Claus Peter
Patentanwalt
Heinrich-Lilienfein-Weg 5
76229 Karlsruhe / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/01]Pietruk, Claus Peter, Dipl.-Phys.
Woogstrasse 4
67659 Kaiserslautern / DE
Application number, filing date99915513.812.03.1999
[2001/01]
WO1999DE00693
Priority number, dateDE199811115014.03.1998         Original published format: DE 19811150
[2001/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9947914
Date:23.09.1999
Language:DE
[1999/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1064543
Date:03.01.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.1999
[2001/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1064543
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N30/95, G01N21/59
[2001/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/01]
TitleGerman:DÜNNSCHICHTCHROMATOGRAPHIEGERÄT[2001/01]
English:THIN-LAYER CHROMATOGRAPHY APPARATUS[2001/01]
French:APPAREIL DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE EN COUCHE MINCE[2001/01]
Entry into regional phase16.10.2000National basic fee paid 
16.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
16.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
10.09.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
29.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.2002Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
30.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2003Fee for grant paid
18.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI04.06.2003
FR04.06.2003
IT04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
[2013/46]
Former [2008/17]FI04.06.2003
FR04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
IT04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2006/14]FI04.06.2003
FR04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/29]FI04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/22]FI04.06.2003
GB04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/10]FI04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/05]FI04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/03]NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/02]NL04.06.2003
GR04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE3247355  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,10,12 * page 4, line 1 - line 15 * * page 11, line 7 - line 17 * * page 12, line 2 - line 14 * * figures III,IV * [Y] 7-9,11,13-15,18,19;
 [Y]DE4133131  (ULTRAKUST ELECTRONIC GMBH) [Y] 7,9 * column 1, line 3 - line 21 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 20; figure 1 *;
 [Y]FR2661986  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [Y] 8 * page 7, line 14 - page 8, line 11; figure 3 *;
 [Y]DE2047952  (ZEISS CARL FA) [Y] 11 * page 1, line 1 - line 4 * * page 8, line 15 - line 25; figure 6 *;
 [Y]JPH06333125  ;
 [Y]DE4433305  (O K TEC OPTIK KERAMIK TECHNOLO [DE]) [Y] 14,15 * column 2, line 4 - line 14 * * column 2, line 56 - line 64; figures 3-5 *;
 [Y]EP0457526  (LABINTELLIGENCE INC [US]) [Y] 18 * column 5, line 19 - line 25 * * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 10 *;
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950428), vol. 095, no. 003, [Y] 13 * abstract *
 [Y]  - VOVK I ET AL, "Quantitative evaluation of chromatograms from totally illuminated thin-layer chromatographic plates", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (19970425), vol. 768, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9673, page 329-333, XP004064168 [Y] 19 * page 329, column L, line 6 - page 330, column L, line 22; figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(96)01070-9