Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1080513

EP1080513 - AUTOMOBILE ANTENNA DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  05.12.2008
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hirschmann Electronics GmbH & Co. KG
Stuttgarter Strasse 45-51
72654 Neckartenzlingen / DE
[2001/10]
Inventor(s)01 / WENDT, Dirk
Pappelweg 1
D-72555 Metzingen / DE
02 / LIPKA, Günter
Schillerstrasse 34
D-73779 Deizisau / DE
03 / JÄGER, Werner
Holbeinweg 8
A-6845 Hohenems / AT
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Thul, Hermann
Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Rheinmetall Platz 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Thul, Hermann
Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2004/11]Thul, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys.
Zentrale Patentabteilung, Rheinmetall AG, Rheinmetall Allee 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2001/10]Stadler, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing.
Weikersheimer Strasse 17
70435 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99915696.123.03.1999
[2001/10]
WO1999EP01980
Priority number, dateDE199812320225.05.1998         Original published format: DE 19823202
[2001/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9962136
Date:02.12.1999
Language:DE
[1999/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1080513
Date:07.03.2001
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999
[2001/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1080513
Date:13.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/46]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1080513
Date:07.01.2009
Language:DE
[2009/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/12, H01Q23/00
[2001/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/10]
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUG-ANTENNENEINRICHTUNG[2001/10]
English:AUTOMOBILE ANTENNA DEVICE[2001/10]
French:SYSTEME D'ANTENNE POUR VEHICULE[2001/10]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2000National basic fee paid 
11.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.07.2000Examination requested  [2001/10]
07.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2002Fee for grant paid
28.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.08.2003  02.03.2007  WITHDRAWN
Fuba Automotive GmbH & Co.KG TecCenter
31162 Bad Salzdetfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Liska, Horst
Weickmann & Weickmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2007/42]
Opponent(s)01  13.08.2003  02.03.2007  WITHDRAWN
Fuba Automotive GmbH & Co.KG TecCenter
31162 Bad Salzdetfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Liska, Horst
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Former [2003/42]
Opponent(s)01  13.08.2003  26.08.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Fuba Automotive GmbH & Co.KG TecCenter
31162 Bad Salzdetfurt / DE
Opponent's representative
Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing.
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
18.09.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.03.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.02.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
01.07.2008Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
01.07.2008Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.09.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
27.11.2008Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition13.04.2006Appeal received No.  T0580/06
14.06.2006Statement of grounds filed
01.07.2008Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
01.07.2008Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES24.03.2006
SE24.03.2006
IT23.03.2007
[2010/06]
Former [2008/17]ES24.03.2006
SE24.03.2006
Former [2006/49]SE24.03.2006
Cited inInternational search[XY]GB2210730  (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,10,24,25 * sentence A * * page 6, paragraph L - page 8 * * page 11, paragraph L - page 12; figure 1 * [Y] 4,5,11-19;
 [Y]EP0791975  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 4,5,11-19 * abstract * * column 5, line 16 - column 9, line 51; figures 1-9 *;
 [A]US4623207  (SASAKI MASAO [JP], et al) [A] 1,10-19 * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 31; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]DE2328168  (KOLBE & CO HANS) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claims 1-7 *;
 [A]DE2328167  (KOLBE & CO HANS) [A] 1 * figures 1-5; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]US5363114  (SHOEMAKER KEVIN O [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 24 - column 5, line 5; figure 6 *;
 [A]EP0506451  (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *
OppositionJPH08321714
 DE4307232
 DE19536131
 EP0033472