Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1080513 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1080513



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 523
11.12.2008 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
11.12.2008 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
08.12.2008 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
27.11.2008 English translation of the claims Opposition 5
27.11.2008 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
27.11.2008 French translation of claims Opposition 5
26.09.2008 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
26.09.2008 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
26.09.2008 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
26.09.2008 Text intended for grant Opposition 11
17.09.2008 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
30.07.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.07.2008 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 27
10.07.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
03.07.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 12
03.06.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 7
06.03.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.03.2008 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
26.02.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
18.02.2008 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 8
14.02.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
14.02.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
12.02.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.09.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.09.2007 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
14.09.2007 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
13.09.2007 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
12.09.2007 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
12.09.2007 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
12.09.2007 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
12.09.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.09.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.08.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
17.08.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
21.07.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.07.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.07.2007 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 16
29.06.2007 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
01.06.2007 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
09.03.2007 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition of an opponent not being appellant Appeal 2
05.03.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.03.2007 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 1
06.02.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.01.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.12.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.12.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.12.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.12.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.11.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
26.10.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.10.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.10.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.10.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.10.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.10.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.10.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.10.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
29.09.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
29.09.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
18.07.2006 Communication of loss of rights: deficiency according to Art. 108 EPC Appeal 2
18.07.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.07.2006 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
26.06.2006 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.06.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.06.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
20.06.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
14.06.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 7
09.06.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
02.05.2006 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
20.04.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
18.04.2006 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
13.04.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
14.02.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.02.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.02.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.02.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.02.2006 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
08.02.2006 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
08.02.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 8
08.02.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.09.2004 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
06.04.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.03.2004 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
16.02.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.02.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
23.01.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.01.2004 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
23.01.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
20.01.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.01.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.11.2003 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
18.09.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
18.09.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
11.09.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.09.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.08.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.08.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
28.08.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.08.2003 Authorisation Opposition 1
18.08.2003 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
13.08.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
13.08.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.08.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.08.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
13.08.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
13.08.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.08.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.08.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.08.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
04.10.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.06.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.06.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
28.06.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
10.06.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
29.05.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.05.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
14.05.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.05.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
20.03.2002 Description Search / examination 1
20.03.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.03.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
07.03.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.02.2002 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.01.2001 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.01.2001 Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant Search / examination 1
21.12.2000 Annex Search / examination 6
21.12.2000 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 1
16.12.2000 Annex Search / examination 5
16.12.2000 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 2
11.07.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
21.06.2000 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.06.2000 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
21.06.2000 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.06.2000 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.02.2000 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.02.2000 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
14.12.1999 Priority document Search / examination 24
10.12.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
02.12.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
02.12.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 24
26.11.1999 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.11.1999 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
26.11.1999 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
20.09.1999 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.09.1999 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.09.1999 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
03.05.1999 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
03.05.1999 Claims International Searching Authority 5
03.05.1999 Description International Searching Authority 14
03.05.1999 Drawings International Searching Authority 3