Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1069819

EP1069819 - METHOD FOR SELECTIVE INCREASE OF THE ANTICARCINOGENIC GLUCOSINOLATES IN BRASSICA SPECIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/04]METHOD FOR SELECTIVE INCREASE OF THE ANTICARCINOGENIC GLUCOSINOLATES IN $i(BRASSICA SP.)
[2001/45]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Database last updated on 25.05.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.05.2016Change: Despatch of interlocutory decision 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Plant Bioscience Limited
Norwich Research Park, Colney Lane Norwich
Norfolk NR4 7UH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/04]For all designated states
Plant Bioscience Limited
Norwich Research Park, Colney Lane
Norwich, Norfolk NR4 7UH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / MITHEN, Richard
4 Colton Road Cottages, Marlingford
Norwich, Norfolk NR9 5MS / GB
02 / FAULKNER, Kathy
26 Sedge Road, Scarning
East Dereham, Norfolk MR19 2UA / GB
[2001/04]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/48]Williams, Aylsa , et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2008/24]Harding, Charles Thomas , et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2001/04]Maschio, Antonio
D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date99915886.808.04.1999
[2001/04]
WO1999GB01079
Priority number, dateUS19980081169P09.04.1998         Original published format: US 81169 P
[2001/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9952345
Date:21.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1069819
Date:24.01.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999
[2001/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1069819
Date:24.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/30]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP21.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:A01H5/10
[2001/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   GB,   GR,   IE,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/04]
Extension statesAL09.10.2000
LT09.10.2000
LV09.10.2000
MK09.10.2000
RO09.10.2000
SI09.10.2000
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR SELEKTIVEN ERHÖHUNG DES ANTICARCINOGENEN GLUCOSINOLATE BEI BRASSICA SORTEN[2001/45]
English:METHOD FOR SELECTIVE INCREASE OF THE ANTICARCINOGENIC GLUCOSINOLATES IN BRASSICA SPECIES[2001/45]
French:PROCEDE PAR SELECTION D'ACCROISSEMENT DES GLUCOSINOLATES ANTICARCINOGENES DE LA BRASSICA[2001/04]
Former [2001/04]VERFAHREN ZUR SELEKTIVEN ERHÖHUNG DES ANTICARCINOGENEN GLUCOSINOLATE BEI BRASSICA SP
Former [2001/04]METHOD FOR SELECTIVE INCREASE OF THE ANTICARCINOGENIC GLUCOSINOLATES IN $i(BRASSICA SP.)
Entry into regional phase09.10.2000National basic fee paid 
09.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
13.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2002Fee for grant paid
14.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.04.2003  16.04.2003  ADMISSIBLE
SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
 02  24.04.2003  08.05.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Groupe Limagrain Holding
Rue Henri Mondor
Biopôle Clermont Limagne
63360 Saint-Beauzire / FR
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
 [2015/23]
Former [2015/17]
Opponent(s)01  22.04.2003  16.04.2003  ADMISSIBLE
SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Syngenta International AG
No. 557
WRO 4008-Z1-26
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
 02  24.04.2003  08.05.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Groupe Limagrain Holding
Rue Henri Mondor
Biopôle Clermont Limagne
63360 Saint-Beauzire / FR
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Former [2008/35]
Opponent(s)01  22.04.2003  16.04.2003  ADMISSIBLE
SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Kock, Michael Andreas
Syngenta International AG Schwarzwaldallee 215
CH-4002 Basel / CH
 02  24.04.2003  08.05.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Groupe Limagrain Holding
Rue Limagrain BP no. 1
63720 Chappes / FR
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
ERNEST GUTMANN - YVES PLASSERAUD S.A.S. 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Former [2007/30]
Opponent(s)01  22.04.2003  16.04.2003  ADMISSIBLE
SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Kock, Michael Andreas
Syngenta International AG Schwarzwaldallee 215
CH-4002 Basel / CH
 02  24.04.2003  08.05.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Groupe Limagrain Holding
Rue Limagrain BP no. 1
63720 Chappes / FR
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud SA 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Former [2006/21]
Opponent(s)01  22.04.2003  16.04.2003  ADMISSIBLE
SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Bastian, Werner Maria
Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
 02  24.04.2003  08.05.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Groupe Limagrain Holding
Rue Limagrain BP no. 1
63720 Chappes / FR
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud SA 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Former [2005/16]
Opponent(s)01  22.04.2003  16.04.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Syngenta Participations AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Bastian, Werner Maria
Syngenta Participations AG, Intellectual Property, P.O. Box
4002 Basel / CH
 02  24.04.2003  08.05.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Groupe Limagrain Holding
Rue Limagrain BP no. 1
63720 Chappes / FR
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud SA 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Former [2005/10]
Opponent(s)01  22.04.2003  16.04.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Syngenta Participations AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Bastian, Werner Maria
Syngenta Participations AG, Intellectual Property, P.O. Box
4002 Basel / CH
 02  24.04.2003  08.05.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Groupe Limagrain Holding
Rue Limagrain BP no. 1
63720 Chartres / FR
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud SA 88, Boulevard des Belges
69452 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Former [2004/26]
Opponent(s)01  22.04.2003  16.04.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Syngenta Participations AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Bastian, Werner Maria
Syngenta Participations AG, Intellectual Property, P.O. Box
4002 Basel / CH
 02  24.04.2003  08.05.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Groupe Limagrain Holding
Rue Limagrain BP no. 1
63720 Chartres / FR
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A., 62 rue de Bonnel
69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR
Former [2003/26]
Opponent(s)01  22.04.2003  16.04.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Syngenta Participations AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Smolders, Walter
Syngenta Participations AG Intellectual Property P.O. Box
4002 Basel / CH
 02  24.04.2003  08.05.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Groupe Limagrain Holding
Rue Limagrain BP no. 1
63720 Chartres / FR
Opponent's representative
Almond-Martin, Carol
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A., 62 rue de Bonnel
69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR
Former [2003/24]
Opponent(s)01  22.04.2003   
Syngenta Participations AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Smolders, Walter (BE)
Syngenta Participations AG Intellectual Property P.O. Box
CH-4002 Basel / CH
21.05.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.11.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.06.2004Date of oral proceedings
09.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
09.07.2004Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.07.2004Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.07.2004Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
26.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2015Reply to a communication from the opposition division
15.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
27.05.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition20.01.2005Appeal received No.  T0083/05
04.04.2005Statement of grounds filed
10.09.2015Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
20.01.2005Appeal received No.  T0083/05
31.03.2005Statement of grounds filed
28.04.2015Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2015/18]
10.09.2015Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
04.05.2006Date of oral proceedings
11.05.2006Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
01.03.2013Date of oral proceedings
13.03.2013Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH24.07.2002
FI24.07.2002
GR24.07.2002
LI24.07.2002
DK24.10.2002
SE24.10.2002
PT25.10.2002
CY08.04.2003
LU08.04.2003
MC30.04.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/44]CH24.07.2002
FI24.07.2002
GR24.07.2002
LI24.07.2002
DK24.10.2002
SE24.10.2002
PT25.10.2002
CY08.04.2003
LU08.04.2003
Former [2004/39]CH24.07.2002
FI24.07.2002
GR24.07.2002
LI24.07.2002
DK24.10.2002
SE24.10.2002
PT25.10.2002
LU08.04.2003
Former [2003/46]CH24.07.2002
FI24.07.2002
GR24.07.2002
LI24.07.2002
DK24.10.2002
SE24.10.2002
PT25.10.2002
Former [2003/31]CH24.07.2002
FI24.07.2002
GR24.07.2002
LI24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
PT25.10.2002
Former [2003/22]FI24.07.2002
GR24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
PT25.10.2002
Former [2003/20]FI24.07.2002
GR24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
Former [2003/14]FI24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
Former [2003/03]SE24.10.2002
Cited inInternational search[XD]  MITHEN, R.F. ET AL: "Glucosinolates of wild and cultivated brassica species" PHYTOCHEMISTRY, vol. 26, no. 7, 1987, pages 1969-1973, XP002110359 cited in the application

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-9422(00)81740-9
 [AD]  CARLSON, D.G. ET AL.: "Glucosinolates in Crucifer Vegetables: Broccoli, Brussels Sprouts, Cauliflower, Collards, Kale, Mustard Greens and Kohlrabi" JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HORTICULTURAL SCIENCE, vol. 112, no. 1, 1987, pages 173-178, XP002110360 cited in the application
 [A]  FAHEY J W ET AL: "Broccoli sprouts: an exceptionally rich source of inducers of enzymes that protect against chemical carcinogens." PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, vol. 94, no. 19, 1997, pages 10367-10372, XP002086077 Correspondence (Reprint) address, P. Talalay, Dep. of Pharmacology & Molecular Sci., Johns Hopkins Sch. of

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.19.10367