blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1069819


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.12.2016 Patent maintained (B2 publication) published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
13.12.2016 New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid
27.09.2016 New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
22.08.2016 New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision
23.05.2016 Change: Despatch of interlocutory decision
14.01.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit
08.12.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition
25.11.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit
18.09.2015 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
04.09.2015 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
14.07.2015 Change: Date of oral proceedings
07.07.2015 Change - representative
01.05.2015 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
25.04.2015 Change: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit
20.03.2015 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
25.06.2014 Change: Date of oral proceedings
25.06.2014 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.07.2013 Deletion: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
12.03.2013 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.03.2013 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
28.11.2012 Change: Date of oral proceedings
19.11.2012 Change: Date of oral proceedings
19.10.2012 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
13.08.2012 Change: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit
13.08.2012 New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit
14.10.2011 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
22.03.2011 Change: Date of oral proceedings
22.03.2011 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.10.2008 Change - representative published on  26.11.2008  [2008/48]
25.07.2008 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  27.08.2008  [2008/35]
09.05.2008 Change - representative published on  11.06.2008  [2008/24]
22.06.2007 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  25.07.2007  [2007/30]
09.05.2006 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.04.2006 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  24.05.2006  [2006/21]
10.02.2006 Change: Date of oral proceedings
10.02.2006 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.10.2005 Change: Appeal number
08.04.2005 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
01.04.2005 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
04.03.2005 Unpublished change to opponent data
04.03.2005 Deletion: Examination of admissibility of opposition: despatch of communication + time limit
04.03.2005 Deletion: Examination of admissibility of opposition: receipt of reply
04.03.2005 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  20.04.2005  [2005/16]
24.01.2005 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
21.01.2005 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
21.01.2005 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  09.03.2005  [2005/10]
17.01.2005 Unpublished change to opponent data
26.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.01.2005  [2005/02]
19.11.2004 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
10.09.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.10.2004  [2004/44]
06.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.09.2004  [2004/39]
14.07.2004 New entry: Despatch of observations of proprietor to parties involved + time limit
14.07.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition
06.07.2004 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.07.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit
07.05.2004 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  23.06.2004  [2004/26]
05.05.2004 Unpublished change to opponent data
30.01.2004 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
27.11.2003 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.10.2003 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
26.09.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.11.2003  [2003/46]
13.06.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.07.2003  [2003/31]
17.05.2003 Observations of proprietor on opposition
09.05.2003 Opposition filed published on  25.06.2003  [2003/26]
09.05.2003 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  25.06.2003  [2003/26]
05.05.2003 Unpublished change to opponent data
25.04.2003 Unpublished change to opponent data
25.04.2003 Opposition filed published on  11.06.2003  [2003/24]
15.04.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.05.2003  [2003/22]
28.03.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.05.2003  [2003/20]
15.02.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.04.2003  [2003/14]
29.11.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.01.2003  [2003/03]
07.06.2002 (Expected) grant published on  24.07.2002  [2002/30]
30.04.2002 Renewal fee
08.04.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.01.2002 Communication of intention to grant
16.01.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.10.2001 Communication of intention to grant
21.09.2001 Change - German title published on  07.11.2001 [2001/45]
28.06.2001 Examination report or reply
12.04.2001 Renewal fee
09.03.2001 First examination report
08.03.2001 Examination report or reply
08.12.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.01.2001 [2001/04]
08.12.2000 Request for examination filed published on  24.01.2001 [2001/04]
24.10.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
24.10.2000 Change - extension states
17.10.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
03.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
09.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
28.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
22.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
30.07.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
27.05.1999 PCT data prior to European publication