Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1069819

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 CHLapse: 24.07.2002
CYLapse: 08.04.2003
 DE 
 DKLapse: 24.10.2002
 ES 
 FILapse: 24.07.2002
 GB 
 GRLapse: 24.07.2002
 IE 
 LILapse: 24.07.2002
 LULapse: 08.04.2003
 MCLapse: 30.04.2003
 NL 
 PTLapse: 25.10.2002
 SELapse: 24.10.2002
Examination procedure14.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase09.10.2000National basic fee paid 
09.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted24.07.2002
Opposition procedure09.12.2016Fee for printing new specification paid 
Appeal following opposition20.01.2005APPEAL FILED
04.04.2005APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
10.09.2015APPEAL RESULT
20.01.2005APPEAL FILED
31.03.2005APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
28.04.2015COMMUNICATION A.110(2) DISPATCHED
10.09.2015APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:24.01.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:24.01.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL PAYMENT 20001009;LT PAYMENT 20001009;LV PAYMENT 20001009;MK PAYMENT 20001009;RO PAYMENT 20001009;SI PAYMENT 20001009
 
Event date:24.01.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20001009
 
Event date:25.04.2001 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20010313
 
Event date:07.11.2001 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:METHOD FOR SELECTIVE INCREASE OF THE ANTICARCINOGENIC GLUCOSINOLATES IN BRASSICA SPECIES
 
Event date:24.07.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20020724
 
Event date:24.07.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20020724
 
Event date:24.07.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20020724
 
Event date:24.07.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20020724
 
Event date:24.07.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:24.07.2002 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:220852
Country of Ref Document:AT
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20020815
Kind Code of Ref Document:T
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:24.07.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:24.07.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL PAYMENT 20001009;LT PAYMENT 20001009;LV PAYMENT 20001009;MK PAYMENT 20001009;RO PAYMENT 20001009;SI PAYMENT 20001009
 
Event date:31.07.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:21.08.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:29.08.2002 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69902246
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20020829
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:24.10.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20021024
 
Event date:24.10.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20021024
 
Event date:25.10.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20021025
 
Event date:30.12.2002 
Event description:LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION
Effective DATE:20020724
 
Event date:16.01.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2179640 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:31.01.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:08.04.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20030408
 
Event date:08.04.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20030408
 
Event date:30.04.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20030430
 
Event date:11.06.2003 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
Effective DATE:20030422
 
Event date:25.06.2003 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
Effective DATE:20030422
 
Event date:25.06.2003 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:GROUPE LIMAGRAIN HOLDING
Effective DATE:20030424
 
Event date:01.08.2003 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
 
Event date:01.08.2003 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:GROUPE LIMAGRAIN HOLDING
 
Event date:23.06.2004 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
Effective DATE:20030422
 
Event date:23.06.2004 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:GROUPE LIMAGRAIN HOLDING
Effective DATE:20030424
 
Event date:02.08.2004 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
 
Event date:02.08.2004 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:GROUPE LIMAGRAIN HOLDING
 
Event date:09.03.2005 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
Effective DATE:20030422
 
Event date:09.03.2005 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:GROUPE LIMAGRAIN HOLDING
Effective DATE:20030424
 
Event date:20.04.2005 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
Effective DATE:20030422
 
Event date:20.04.2005 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:GROUPE LIMAGRAIN HOLDING
Effective DATE:20030424
 
Event date:02.05.2005 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
 
Event date:02.05.2005 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:GROUPE LIMAGRAIN HOLDING
 
Event date:01.07.2005 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
 
Event date:01.07.2005 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:GROUPE LIMAGRAIN HOLDING
 
Event date:24.05.2006 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
Effective DATE:20030422
 
Event date:24.05.2006 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:GROUPE LIMAGRAIN HOLDING
Effective DATE:20030424
 
Event date:01.08.2006 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
 
Event date:01.08.2006 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:GROUPE LIMAGRAIN HOLDING
 
Event date:25.07.2007 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
Effective DATE:20030422
 
Event date:25.07.2007 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:GROUPE LIMAGRAIN HOLDING
Effective DATE:20030424
 
Event date:03.09.2007 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
 
Event date:03.09.2007 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:GROUPE LIMAGRAIN HOLDING
 
Event date:22.04.2015 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
Effective DATE:20030422
 
Event date:22.04.2015 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:GROUPE LIMAGRAIN HOLDING
Effective DATE:20030424
 
Event date:03.06.2015 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
Effective DATE:20030422
 
Event date:18.01.2017 
Event description:PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM
Effective DATE:20170118
 
Event date:18.01.2017 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:18.01.2017 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL LT LV MK RO SI
 
Event date:18.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R102 69902246 DE
Code Expl.: EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL
 
Event date:19.04.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL FP
Code Expl.: TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)
 
Event date:06.07.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES DC2A 2179640 ES T5
Code Expl.: PATENT MODIFIED
Effective DATE:20170706
 
Event date:29.06.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20180427
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20180523
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20180427
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20180426
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20180426
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20180420
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20180427
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:08.04.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69902246 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:10.04.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20190407
 
Event date:01.05.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20190407
 
Event date:15.05.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK07 220852 AT T
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY
Effective DATE:20190408
 
Event date:16.05.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20190408
 
Event date:29.05.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MK9A
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20190408
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20190407