Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1098678

EP1098678 - LASER TREATMENT COOLING HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.05.2003
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.06.2003  [2003/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COOLANALGESIA LIMITED
Francis House 112 Hills Road
Cambridge CB2 1PH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/23]For all designated states
COOLANALGESIA LIMITED
Francis House 112 Hills Road
Cambridge CB2 1PH / GB
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
Whitcroft, Ian Andrew
Suite 105, 530 Iowa South East
Huron, SD 57350 / US
For all designated states
McMahon, Richard Anthony
18 Riverside
Cambridge CB5 8HL / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Whitcroft, Ian Andrew
Suite 105, 530 Iowa South East
Huron, SD 57350 / US
02 / McMahon, Richard Anthony
18 Riverside
Cambridge CB5 8HL / GB
 [2002/26]
Former [2001/20]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Brunner, Michael John
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Brunner, Michael John
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99915912.209.04.1999
[2001/20]
WO1999GB01107
Priority number, dateGB1998000779409.04.1998         Original published format: GB 9807794
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9952595
Date:21.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1098678
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1098678
Date:03.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61N5/06
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/20]
TitleGerman:KÜHLKOPF FÜR EINEN LASERBEHANDLUNGSAPPARAT[2001/20]
English:LASER TREATMENT COOLING HEAD[2001/20]
French:TETE DE REFROIDISSEMENT POUR TRAITEMENT LASER[2001/20]
Entry into regional phase22.02.2001National basic fee paid 
22.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
22.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
24.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2002Fee for grant paid
31.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.01.2001AT   M01   Fee paid on   22.02.2001
25.01.2001BE   M01   Fee paid on   22.02.2001
25.01.2001CH   M01   Fee paid on   22.02.2001
25.01.2001CY   M01   Fee paid on   22.02.2001
25.01.2001DE   M01   Fee paid on   22.02.2001
25.01.2001DK   M01   Fee paid on   22.02.2001
25.01.2001ES   M01   Fee paid on   22.02.2001
25.01.2001FI   M01   Fee paid on   22.02.2001
25.01.2001FR   M01   Fee paid on   22.02.2001
25.01.2001GB   M01   Fee paid on   22.02.2001
25.01.2001GR   M01   Fee paid on   22.02.2001
25.01.2001IE   M01   Fee paid on   22.02.2001
25.01.2001IT   M01   Fee paid on   22.02.2001
25.01.2001LU   M01   Fee paid on   22.02.2001
25.01.2001MC   M01   Fee paid on   22.02.2001
25.01.2001NL   M01   Fee paid on   22.02.2001
25.01.2001PT   M01   Fee paid on   22.02.2001
25.01.2001SE   M01   Fee paid on   22.02.2001
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
25.01.2001M01   Fee paid on   22.02.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR03.07.2002
PT03.10.2002
[2003/22]
Former [2003/20]GR03.07.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]US5486172  (CHESS CYRUS [US]) [A] 1,2,11 * column 5, line 6 - column 6, line 64; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US5344418  (GHAFFARI SHAHRIAR [US]) [A] 1,2,11 * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 38 * * column 7, line 39 - column 8, line 34; figures 7,8 *;
 [A]EP0783904  (ESC MEDICAL SYSTEMS LTD [IL]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 50 - column 6, line 17; figures 1,3,4 *;
 [A]US5085657  (BEN-SIMHON HAIM [CA]) [A] 1,3,5 * column 5, line 46 - column 7, line 46 * * abstract *