Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1005761

EP1005761 - ERROR-RECOVERY MECHANISM USING A TEMPORARY FORWARDER IN A WIRELESS-ATM NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.01.2008
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2007/09]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2000/23]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / HULYALKAR, Samir, N.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / NGO, Chiu, Y.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / VERMA, Dinesh, C.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/23]
Representative(s)Groenendaal, Antonius W. M. , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/23]Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria , et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date99915969.203.05.1999
[2000/23]
WO1999IB00798
Priority number, dateUS1998007309505.05.1998         Original published format: US 73095
[2000/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9957913
Date:11.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/45]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1005761
Date:07.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999
[2000/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1005761
Date:28.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/09]
Search report(s)International search reportSE02.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38, H04Q11/04
[2006/35]
Former International [2000/23]H04Q7/00, H04Q11/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/23]
TitleGerman:MECHANISMUS ZUR WIEDERHERSTELLUNG IM FEHLERFALL UNTER NUTZUNG EINES TEMPORÄREN WEITERLEITUNGSKNOTENS IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN ATM-NETZ[2006/35]
English:ERROR-RECOVERY MECHANISM USING A TEMPORARY FORWARDER IN A WIRELESS-ATM NETWORK[2000/23]
French:MECANISME DE RECUPERATION D'ERREURS UTILISANT UN DISPOSITIF DE RETRANSMISSION TEMPORAIRE DANS UN RESEAU MTA SANS FIL[2000/23]
Former [2000/23]MECHANISMUS ZUR FEHLERERKENNUNG MIT EINEM TEMPORÄREN WEITERSENDER IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN ATM-NETZ
Entry into regional phase07.02.2000National basic fee paid 
07.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/23]
24.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.01.2007Fee for grant paid
15.01.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
01.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]US5109528  (UDDENFELDT JAN-ERIK [SE]);
 [X]EP0695102  (ALCATEL STANDARD ELECTRICA [ES]);
 [A]US5625875  (WHINNETT NICHOLAS [GB], et al)